Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2989114

EP2989114 - 2,2-DIFLUOROPROPIONAMIDE DERIVATIVES OF BARDOXOLONE METHYL, POLYMORPHIC FORMS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.05.2019  [2019/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AbbVie Inc.
1 North Waukegan Road
North Chicago, IL 60064 / US
[2016/09]
Inventor(s)01 / SHEIKH, Ahmad Y.
700 Pine Street
Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US
02 / MATTEI, Alessandra
130 S. Canal Street Apt. 701
Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US
03 / WANG, Xiu C.
1649 Saddle Hill Road
Green Oaks, Illinois 60048 / US
 [2016/09]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/21]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2016/09]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners (DE)
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14727306.424.04.2014
[2016/09]
WO2014US35279
Priority number, dateUS201361815502P24.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361815502 P
[2016/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014176415
Date:30.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2989114
Date:02.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2989114
Date:23.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07J63/00, A61K31/565, A61P29/00
[2016/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Extension statesBA10.11.2015
ME10.11.2015
TitleGerman:2,2-DIFLUORPROPIONAMIDDERIVATE VON BARDOXOLONMETHYL, POLYMORPHE FORMEN DAVON UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON[2016/09]
English:2,2-DIFLUOROPROPIONAMIDE DERIVATIVES OF BARDOXOLONE METHYL, POLYMORPHIC FORMS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF[2016/09]
French:DÉRIVÉS 2,2-DIFLUOROPROPIONAMIDE DE BARDOXOLONE MÉTHYLE, FORMES POLYMORPHES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION[2016/09]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2015National basic fee paid 
10.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/09]
08.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2018Fee for grant paid
16.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18170879.3  / EP3453715
Opposition(s)26.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSM23.05.2018
[2019/12]
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2009129546  (REATA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-81 * pages 37-38; compounds 402-16, 402-24, 402-38 * * pages 61-62; table 1a; compounds 402-16, 402-24, 402-38 * * example 1 *;
 [A]WO2012125488  (REATA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-81 * page 46; table 1; compound TX63682 * * page 62; table 1; compound TX63864 *;
 [IP]WO2013163344  (REATA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [IP] 1-81 * claim 1 * * pages 40-41 *
by applicantUS8129429
 US7915402
 US8124799
 US7943778
 US2009060873
 US5599795
 US5443826
    - KARIN M, NATURE, (20060525), vol. 441, no. 7092, pages 431 - 6
    - AGHAJAN ET AL., J GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL., (201203), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 10 - 4
    - HE G; KARIN M, CELL RES., (201101), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 159 - 68
    - GRIVENNIKOV SI; KARIN M, CYTOKINE GROWTH FACTOR REV., (201002), vol. 21, no. L, pages 1 - 9
    - ABRAHAM; KAPPAS, FREE RADICAL BIOL. MED., (2005), vol. 39, pages 1 - 25
    - AHMAD, CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 68, pages 2920 - 2926
    - AHMAD, J. BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 281, pages 35764 - 9
    - AKIYAMA ET AL., ALZHEIMER DIS. ASSOC. DISORD., (2000), vol. 14, no. 1, pages S47 - 53
    - ANGULO ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 30, pages 1263 - 1271
    - ARAUJO, J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 171, no. 3, pages 1572 - 1580
    - AREND; DAYER, ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1995), vol. 38, pages 151 - 160
    - AREND ET AL., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 16, pages 27 - 55
    - AUTENRIETH ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1994), vol. 62, pages 2590 - 2599
    - BACH, HUM. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 67, no. 6, pages 430 - 432
    - BAGASRA, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 12041 - 12045
    - BALL, ANN. RHEUM. DIS., (1971), vol. 30, pages 213 - 223
    - BEAL, CURR. OPIN. NEUROBIOL., (1996), vol. 6, pages 661 - 666
    - BLUMBERG ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1964), vol. 7, pages 93 - 97
    - BOTOMAN ET AL., AM. FAM. PHYSICIAN, (1998), vol. 57, no. 1, pages 57 - 68
    - BRANDT ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 1346 - 1352
    - BRAUN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1999), vol. 42, pages 2039 - 2044
    - BREWERTON ET AL., LANCET, (1973), vol. 1, pages 904 - 907
    - BREWERTON ET AL., LANCET, (1973), vol. 1, pages 956 - 957
    - BRONTE ET AL., TRENDS IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 24, pages 302 - 306
    - BROWN; DUBOIS, J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 2840 - 2855
    - BRYNSKOV ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, no. 13, pages 845 - 850
    - BURGER; DAYER, NEUROLOGY, (1995), vol. 45, no. 6S-6, pages 39 - 43
    - CAI ET AL., NAT. MED., (2005), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 183 - 190
    - CALIN; TAUROG ET AL., The Spondylarthritides, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1998), page 179
    - CANN ET AL., GUT., (1983), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 1135 - 1140
    - CHAUHAN; CHAUHAN, PATHOPHYSIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 171 - 181
    - CHOMARAT ET AL., ARTHRITISRHEUM, (1995), vol. 38, pages 1046 - 1054
    - COYLE; PUTTFARCKEN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, pages 689 - 695
    - CROWELL ET AL., MOL. CANCER. THER., (2003), vol. 2, pages 815 - 823
    - DE WAAL ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 174, pages 1209 - 1220
    - DINARELLO, INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 16, pages 457 - 499
    - DINKOVA-KOSTOVA, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2005), vol. 102, no. 12, pages 4584 - 4589
    - DIONNE ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 112, no. 3, pages 435 - 442
    - DORAN ET AL., J. RHEUMATOL., (2003), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 316 - 320
    - DROSSMAN ET AL., DIG. DIS. SCI., (1993), vol. 38, no. 9, pages 1569 - 1580
    - DROSSMAN ET AL., GASTROENTEROL., (1997), vol. 112, no. 6, pages 2120 - 2137
    - DUDHGAONKAR, EUR. J. PAIN, (2006), vol. 10, no. 7, pages 573 - 9
    - EASTGATE ET AL., LANCET, (1988), vol. 2, no. 8613, pages 706 - 9
    - EIKELENBOOM ET AL., GLIA, (2002), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 232 - 239
    - ETTEHADI ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 96, no. 1, pages 146 - 151
    - EVERHART ET AL., GASTROENTEROT., (1991), vol. 100, no. 4, pages 998 - 1005
    - FEARON; LOCKSLEY, SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 272, no. 5258, pages 50 - 53
    - FELDTKELLER ET AL., RHEUMATOL. INT., (2003), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 61 - 66
    - FIRESTEIN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 644 - 652
    - FORSTERMANN, BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 387, page 1521
    - FUJIKAWA ET AL., ANN. RHEUM. DIS., (1995), vol. 54, pages 318 - 320
    - FUNAKOSHI ET AL., DIGESTION, (1998), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 73 - 78
    - GALLEY; WEBSTER, BR. J. ANAESTH., (1996), vol. 77, pages 11 - 16
    - GEHRMANN ET AL., GLIA, (1995), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 141 - 151
    - GENAIN; NAUSER, J. MOL. MED., (1997), vol. 75, pages 187 - 197
    - GLADMAN ET AL., BR. J. RHEUMATOL., (1995), vol. 22, pages 675 - 679
    - GLADMAN, J. MED., (1987), vol. 62, pages 127 - 141
    - GLADMAN, RHEUM. DIS. CLIN. NORTH AM., (1992), vol. 18, pages 247 - 256
    - GOODMAN ET AL., KIDNEY INT., (2007), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 945 - 953
    - GRAEBER ET AL., GLIA, (2002), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 252 - 259
    - GRETEN ET AL., CELL, (2004), vol. 118, pages 285 - 296
    - GRIFFIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, no. 19, pages 7611 - 7615
    - GUILHERME ET AL., NAT. REV. MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2008), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 367 - 77
    - GWEE ET AL., GUT., (1999), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 400 - 406
    - HAHN; TSAO, Dubois' Lupus Erythematosus, LEA AND FEBIGER, (1993), pages 195 - 201
    - HANNUM ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 343, pages 336 - 340
    - HANSON ET AL., BMC MEDICAL GENETICS, (2005), vol. 6, no. 7
    - HANSSON ET AL., ANNU. REV. PATHOL. MECH. DIS., (2006), vol. 1, pages 297 - 329
    - HARRISON ET AL., J. RHEUMATOL., (1998), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 2324 - 2330
    - HART ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 84, pages 536 - 542
    - HONDA, BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2002), vol. 12, pages 1027 - 1030
    - HONDA, BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1997), vol. 7, pages 1623 - 1628
    - HONDA, BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1998), vol. 8, no. 19, pages 2711 - 2714
    - HONDA, BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1999), vol. 9, no. 24, pages 3429 - 3434
    - HONDA, J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 4233 - 4246
    - HONDA, J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 1866 - 1877
    - HORWITZ; FISHER, N. ENGL. J. MED., (2001), vol. 344, no. 24, pages 1846 - 1850
    - HOTAMISLIGIL, NATURE, (2006), vol. 444, no. 7121, pages 860 - 7
    - ISHIKAWA ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 104, no. 15, pages 1831 - 1836
    - ISHIZAWA; DICKSON, J. NEUROPATHOL. EXP. NEUROL., (2001), vol. 60, no. 6, pages 647 - 657
    - JACOB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1233 - 1237
    - JAILWALA ET AL., ANN. INTERN. MED., (2000), vol. 133, no. 2, pages 136 - 147
    - JARVIS, CURR. OPIN. RHEUMATOL., (1998), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 459 - 467
    - JARVIS, PEDIATR. ANN., (2002), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 437 - 446
    - JONES ET AL., BR. J. RHEUMATOL., (1994), vol. 33, no. 9, pages 834 - 839
    - JONSSON ET AL., BR. J. RHEUMATOL., (1993), vol. 32, no. 7, pages 578 - 581
    - JONSSON ET AL., ORAL DIS., (2002), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 130 - 140
    - JONSSON ET AL., TRENDS IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 22, no. 12, pages 653 - 654
    - KAHLE ET AL., ANN. RHEUM. DIS., (1992), vol. 51, pages 731 - 734
    - KALTSCHMIDT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 2642 - 2647
    - KAWAKAMI ET AL., BRAIN DEV., (2006), vol. 28, no. 4, pages 243 - 246
    - KELLOW; PHILLIPS, GASTROENTEROL., (1987), vol. 92, no. 6, pages 1885 - 1893
    - KENDALL-TACKETT, TRAUMA VIOLENCE ABUSE, (2007), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 117 - 126
    - KHAN ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (1998), vol. 71, pages 78 - 87
    - KHAN ET AL., TOXICOL. APPLIEDPHARMACOL., (1990), vol. 103, pages 482 - 490
    - KORTYLEWSKI ET AL., NAT. MED., (2005), vol. 11, pages 1314 - 1321
    - KOTAKE ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1999), vol. 67, pages 2682 - 2686
    - KOTZIN, CELL, (1996), vol. 85, pages 303 - 306
    - KRUGER ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2006), vol. 319, no. 3, pages 1144 - 1152
    - KUBOYAMA, KURUMEMED. J, (1998), vol. 45, no. 1, pages 33 - 37
    - LAHESMAA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 3079 - 3085
    - LEE, GLIA., (2007), vol. 55, no. 7, pages 712 - 22
    - LENCZ, MOL. PSYCHIATRY, (2007), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 572 - 80
    - LIBY, CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 4789 - 4798
    - LIBY, NAT. REV. CANCER, (2007), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 357 - 356
    - LIPSKY ET AL., Harrison's Principles of Internal Medicine, MCGRAW-HILL, (1998), pages 1880 - 1888
    - LIU, FASEB J., (2006), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 207 - 216
    - LO ET AL., CURR. DIR. AUTOIMMUN., (1999), vol. 1, pages 226 - 246
    - LUGERING ET AL., ITAL. J. GASTROENTEROL. HEPATOL., (1998), vol. 30, no. 3, pages 338 - 344
    - LYNN; FRIEDMAN, N. ENGL. J. MED., (1993), vol. 329, no. 26, pages 1940 - 1945
    - MACATONIA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 3755 - 3765
    - MARSAL ET AL., RHEUMATOLOGY, (1999), vol. 38, pages 332 - 337
    - MAZUR ET AL., CELL MICROBIOL., (2007), vol. 9, no. 7, pages 1683 - 94
    - MAZZONI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 168, pages 689 - 695
    - MCALINDON ET AL., GUT, (1998), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 214 - 219
    - MCGEER; MCGEER, BRAIN RES. BRAIN RES. REV., (1995), vol. 21, pages 195 - 218
    - MCGEER ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (1996), vol. 19, pages 331 - 338
    - MCGONAGLE ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 694 - 700
    - MCGONAGLE, CURR. OPIN. RHEUMATOL., (1999), vol. 11, pages 244 - 250
    - MCIVER ET AL., PAIN, (2005), vol. 120, no. 1-2, pages 161 - 9
    - MEASE ET AL., LANCET, (2000), vol. 356, pages 385 - 390
    - MERRILL; BENVENIST, TRENDS NEUROSCI., (1996), vol. 19, pages 331 - 338
    - MERTZ ET AL., GASTROENTEROL., (2000), vol. 118, no. 5, pages 842 - 848
    - MOLL; WRIGHT, ANN. RHEUM. DIS., (1973), vol. 32, pages 181 - 201
    - MOLL; WRIGHT, SEMIN. ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1973), vol. 3, pages 55 - 78
    - MCIVER, PAIN, (2005), vol. 120, no. 1-2, pages 161 - 9
    - MORRIS, J. MOL. MED., (2002), vol. 80, no. 2, pages 96 - 104
    - MORSE; CHOI, AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (2005), vol. 172, no. 6, pages 660 - 670
    - MORSE; CHOI, AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (2002), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 8 - 16
    - NATH ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (2006), vol. 66, no. 1, pages 149 - 150
    - NEAL ET AL., BMJ., (1997), vol. 314, no. 7083, pages 779 - 782
    - NICHOLS, DRUG NEWS PERSPECT., (2004), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 99 - 104
    - NIELEN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2004), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 380 - 386
    - OHNISHI ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 6, pages 817 - 830
    - PALL, MED. HYPOTH., (2007), vol. 69, pages 821 - 825
    - PARTSCH ET AL., BR. J. RHEUMATOL., (1997), vol. 24, pages 518 - 523
    - PICA ET AL., ANTIMICROBAGENTS CHEMOTHER., (2000), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 200 - 4
    - PERGOLA, N ENGL JMED, (2011), vol. 365, pages 327 - 336
    - PIMENTEL ET AL., AM. J. GASTROENTEROL., (2000), vol. 95, no. 12, pages 3503 - 3506
    - PRIEUR ET AL., LANCET, (1987), vol. 2, pages 1240 - 1242
    - PLACE, CLIN. CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 9, no. 7, pages 2798 - 806
    - RAJAKARIAR, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2007), vol. 104, no. 52, pages 20979 - 84
    - RANTAPAA-DAHLQVIST ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2003), vol. 48, no. 10, pages 2741 - 2749
    - REIMUND ET AL., EUR. J. CLIN. INVEST., (1998), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 145 - 150
    - RIBBENS ET AL., EUR. CYTOKINE NETW., (2000), vol. 11, pages 669 - 676
    - ROGERS ET AL., NEUROBIOL AGING, (1988), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 339 - 349
    - ROGLER; ANDUS, WORLDJ. SURG., (1998), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 382 - 389
    - ROONEY ET AL., RHEUMATOLLNT., (1990), vol. 10, pages 217 - 219
    - ROSS, AM. J. CLIN. PATHOL., (2003), vol. 120, pages S53 - 71
    - ROSS, EXPERT REV. MOL. DIAGN., (2003), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 573 - 585
    - ROSTOM ET AL., ANN. INTERN. MED., (2007), vol. 146, pages 376 - 389
    - ROTHSTEIN, MED. CLIN. NORTH AM., (2000), vol. 84, no. 5, pages 1247 - 1257
    - RUSTER, SCAND. J. RHEUMATOL., (2005), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 460 - 3
    - SACERDOTI, CURR NEUROVASC RES., (2005), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 103 - 111
    - SAHA, J BIOL CHEM, (2010), vol. 285, pages 40581 - 92
    - SAIKI ET AL., SCAND. J. GASTROENTEROL., (1998), vol. 33, no. 6, pages 616 - 622
    - SALOMONSSON; JONSSON, ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2003), vol. 48, no. 11, pages 3187 - 3201
    - SALOMONSSON ET AL., SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 336 - 342
    - SALVARANI ET AL., CURR. OPIN. RHEUMATOL., (19971225), vol. 10, pages 299 - 305
    - SALVEMINI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 93, pages 1940 - 1947
    - SANDLER, GASTROENTEROL., (1990), vol. 99, no. 2, pages 409 - 415
    - SALVEMINI, J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 93, no. 5, pages 1940 - 1947
    - SARCHIELLI, CEPHALALGIA, (2006), vol. 26, no. 9, pages 1071 - 1079
    - SATOH, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2006), vol. 103, no. 3, pages 768 - 773
    - SCHLAAK ET AL., CLIN. EXP. RHEUMATOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 155 - 162
    - SCHLAAK ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 22, pages 2771 - 2776
    - SCHLOSSTEIN ET AL., NE J. MEDICINE, (1973), vol. 288, pages 704 - 706
    - SCHREIBER, NETH. J. MED., (1998), vol. 53, no. 6, pages 24 - 31
    - SCHULZ ET AL., ANTIOXID. REDOX. SIG., (2008), vol. 10, page 115
    - SHISHODIA, CLIN CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 12, pages 1828 - 38
    - SIEPER; BRAUN, ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1995), vol. 38, pages 1547 - 1554
    - SIMON ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 94, pages 122 - 126
    - SIMON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 8562 - 85666
    - SIMONIAN; COYLE, ANNU. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (1996), vol. 36, pages 83 - 106
    - SINHA ET AL., CANCERRES., (2007), vol. 67, pages 4507 - 4513
    - STACK ET AL., LANCET, (1997), vol. 349, no. 9051, pages 521 - 524
    - STEWART ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (1997), vol. 48, pages 626 - 632
    - STREJAN, J. NEUROIMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 7, page 27
    - SUH, CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, page 717,723
    - SUH, CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 336 - 341
    - SZABO, NATURE REV. DRUG DISC., (2007), vol. 6, pages 662 - 680
    - TAKAHASHI, CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 1233 - 1237
    - TALLEY ET AL., GASTROENTEROL., (1995), vol. 109, no. 6, pages 1736 - 1741
    - TAMIR; TANNENBAUM, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1996), vol. 1288, pages F31 - F36
    - TARGAN ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1997), vol. 337, no. 15, pages 1029 - 1035
    - TOUZANI ET AL., J. NEUROIMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 100, no. 1-2, pages 203 - 215
    - TUMLIN ET AL., AM. J. CARDIOL., (2006), vol. 98, no. 6A, pages 14K - 20K
    - VAN DEN BERG, SEMIN. ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2001), vol. 30, no. 5S-2, pages 7 - 16
    - VAN DULLEMEN ET AL., GASTROENTEROL., (1995), vol. 109, no. 1, pages 129 - 135
    - VAN HOGEZAND; VERSPAGET, DRUGS, (1998), vol. 56, no. 3, pages 299 - 305
    - VAZQUEZ ET AL., J. VIROL., (2005), vol. 79, no. 7, pages 4479 - 91
    - VODOVOTZ ET AL., Handbook of experimental Immunology, (1996), vol. I-IV
    - WARDLE, NEPHROL. DIAL, TRANSPLANT., (2001), vol. 16, no. 9, pages 1764 - 8
    - WARRINGTON ET AL., ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, (2001), vol. 44, pages 13 - 20
    - WEYAND; GORONZY, ANN. NYACAD. SCI., (2003), vol. 987, pages 140 - 149
    - WHITEHEAD ET AL., GASTROENTEROL., (1990), vol. 98, pages 1187 - 1192
    - WILLIAMS ET AL., CLIN. NEUROSCI., (1994), vol. 2, no. 3-4, pages 229 - 245
    - WORDSWORTH, Genes andArthritis, Brit. Medical Bulletin, (1995), vol. 51, pages 249 - 266
    - WRIGHT, ANN. RHEUM. DIS., (1956), vol. 15, pages 348 - 356
    - WRIGHT, CLIN. ORTHOP. RELATED RES., (1979), vol. 143, pages 8 - 14
    - XANTHOU ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2001), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 408 - 418
    - YIN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1997), vol. 40, pages 1788 - 1797
    - YIN ET AL., RHEUMATOLOGY, (1999), vol. 38, pages 1058 - 1067
    - YOH ET AL., KIDNEY INT., (2001), vol. 60, no. 4, pages 1343 - 1353
    - YORE, MOL CANCER THER, (2006), vol. 5, pages 3232 - 9
    - YU ET AL., NAT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 7, pages 41 - 51
    - ZHOU ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (2005), vol. 166, no. 1, pages 27 - 37
    - ZHOU ET AL., CANCER SCI., (2007), vol. 98, pages 882 - 889
    - ZINGARELLI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 171, no. 12, pages 6827 - 6837
 US20060352473