Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3001856

EP3001856 - LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seidel GmbH & Co. KG
Rosenstraße 8
35037 Marburg / DE
[2016/14]
Inventor(s)01 / RITZENHOFF, Andreas
Wilhelm-Busch-Strasse 56
35039 Marburg / DE
02 / ENGEL, Lutz
Unterm Rotscheid 3
57234 Wilnsdorf / DE
03 / RACHE, Jörg
Auf dem Wulf 12
35041 Marburg-Michelbach / DE
04 / ARNOLD, Oliver
Auf den Höfen 1
35232 Dautphetal-Allendorf / DE
 [2016/14]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/14]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14727732.113.05.2014
[2016/14]
WO2014EP59793
Priority number, dateDE20131010501115.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013105011
DE20141010140305.02.2014         Original published format: DE102014101403
[2016/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014184207
Date:20.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3001856
Date:06.04.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014
[2016/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:F21V15/01, F21K99/00, F21V3/04, F21Y101/00, F21V23/00
[2016/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/14]
TitleGerman:LEUCHTVORRICHTUNG[2016/14]
English:LIGHTING DEVICE[2016/14]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE[2016/14]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2015National basic fee paid 
11.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/14]
13.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE102009056115  (LEDON LIGHTING JENNERSDORF GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,2,6-8,13 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0046] * * figure 1a * [I] 3-5,9,12;
 [XI]WO2012020366  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,13 * page 3, paragraph 9 - page 5, line 1 * * figure 1 * [I] 6,9,12;
 [XI]US2010109499  (VILGIATE ANTHONY W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,13 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] * * figure 4 * [I] 9,12;
 [XI]CN201983014U  (ZHEJIANG SHENGHUI LIGHTING CO) [X] 1,2,7,13 * the whole document * [I] 9,12