Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3010944

EP3010944 - PRE-POLYMERIZED CATALYST COMPONENTS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Soperga 14/A
20127 Milano / IT
[2016/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BRITA, Diego
C/O Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
P.le G. Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
02 / COLLINA, Gianni
C/O Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
P.le G. Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
03 / MORINI, Giampiero
C/O Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
P.le Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
 [2016/17]
Representative(s)Giberti, Stefano
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Privato Donegani 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
[2016/17]
Application number, filing date14728587.810.06.2014
[2016/17]
WO2014EP61958
Priority number, dateEP2013017237718.06.2013         Original published format: EP 13172377
[2016/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014202420
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3010944
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014
[2016/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3010944
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/649, C08F110/06, C08F110/02, C08F4/654
[2016/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORPOLYMERISIERTE KATALYSATORKOMPONENTEN ZUR POLYMERISIERUNG VON OLEFINEN[2017/14]
English:PRE-POLYMERIZED CATALYST COMPONENTS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS[2016/17]
French:COMPOSANTS DE CATALYSEUR PRÉ-POLYMÉRISÉS POUR LA POLYMÉRISATION DES OLÉFINES[2017/14]
Former [2016/17]VORPOLYMERISIERTE KATALYSATORKOMPONENTEN ZUR OLEFINPOLYMERISATION
Former [2016/17]COMPOSANTS CATALYTIQUES PRÉPOLYMÉRISÉS DESTINÉS À LA POLYMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES
Entry into regional phase15.12.2015National basic fee paid 
15.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/17]
23.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2017Fee for grant paid
03.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)17.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
[2019/15]
Former [2018/40]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/24]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/12]LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/11]LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/09]LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/08]LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010168341  (FUJIWARA YASUKI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * comparative examples 3 and 11, tables 3 and 5 *;
 [A]WO2006040240  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-14 * examples 1,2 * * page 9, line 14 - line 26 * * claims 1,2,3,8 *;
 [A]WO9845368  (CHISSO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 36 - page 38; example 1 *