Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2996637

EP2996637 - VERTEBRAL IMPLANT, VERTEBRAL FASTENING DEVICE OF THE IMPLANT AND IMPLANT INSTRUMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LDR Medical
4, rue Gustave Eiffel Hotel de Bureaux
10430 Rosières près Troyes / FR
[2019/13]
Former [2016/12]For all designated states
LDR Medical
4, rue Gustave Eiffel Hotel de Bureaux
10430 Rosières près Troyes / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DINVILLE, Hervé
12 rue Jean Jaurès
F-10400 St- Parres-aux-tertres / FR
02 / LEQUETTE, Samuel
11 rue de la Fraternité
F-33600 Pessac / FR
 [2016/12]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/13]
Former [2016/12]Debay, Yves
Cabinet Debay
126, Elysee 2
78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR
Application number, filing date14728850.016.05.2014
[2016/12]
WO2014EP60135
Priority number, dateFR2013005442116.05.2013         Original published format: FR 1354421
[2016/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014184367
Date:20.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2996637
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014
[2016/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2996637
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/44, A61F2/46
[2016/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WIRBELIMPLANTAT, WIRBELBEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG DES IMPLANTATS UND IMPLANTATIONSINSTRUMENT[2016/12]
English:VERTEBRAL IMPLANT, VERTEBRAL FASTENING DEVICE OF THE IMPLANT AND IMPLANT INSTRUMENTATION[2016/12]
French:VERTEBRAL IMPLANT, VERTEBRAL FASTENING DEVICE OF THE IMPLANT AND IMPLANT INSTRUMENTATION[2018/39]
Former [2016/12]IMPLANT VERTÉBRAL, DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION VERTÉBRALE DE L'IMPLANT ET INSTRUMENTATION D'IMPLANT
Entry into regional phase16.12.2015National basic fee paid 
16.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/12]
28.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2019Fee for grant paid
14.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
[2019/38]
Former [2019/37]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2012265259  (LAPOSTA MARIE [US], et al) [X] 9,10,23,24 * paragraph [0066]; figure 7 * [A] 1 [I] 25;
 [XYI]FR2954692  (LDR MEDICAL [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,23,24 * page 78, line 16 - page 79, line 31; figures 1, 13D, 13F, 13G * [Y] 4 [I] 6,7,25;
 [XAI]US2011098747  (DONNER THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,8-10,23,24 * paragraphs [0135] - [0139]; figures 9K, 9L, 11D-11H * [A] 2 [I] 4,6,7,25;
 [YA]WO2013062716  (INCITE INNOVATION LLC [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0052]; figures 3, 4, 7 * [A] 1;
 [A]FR2916956  (LDR MEDICAL [FR]) [A] 6,7 * page 20, line 30 - page 21, line 1; figure 1B *;
 [XAYI]US2005159814  (KARAHALIOS DEAN G [US]) [X] 11,12,15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0026]; figures 2, 4-5 * [A] 14 [Y] 13 [I] 23-25;
 [XI]US2005209697  (PAPONNEAU FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [X] 11,15,23-25 * paragraphs [0038] - [0046]; figures 1-4 * [I] 14,16;
 [YA]US2012197403  (MERVES MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0037]; figure 5 * [A] 11;
 [A]US2012197404  (BRUN PHILIPP [CH], et al) [A] 16 * paragraph [0055]; figures 6A-7B *