Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2988765 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2988765



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 346
15.07.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.06.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
24.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.05.2019 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
24.05.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 3
07.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 34
07.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 34
20.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
20.06.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
20.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
20.06.2018 Description Search / examination 4
20.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
28.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.02.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.02.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.07.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.07.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 18
18.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.02.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.01.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.01.2016 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
18.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.11.2015 Annex Search / examination 1
18.11.2015 Priority search results Search / examination 8
18.11.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.11.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 2
11.11.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
27.10.2015 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.11.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
30.10.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
30.10.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
30.10.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 34
23.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
23.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
23.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
15.07.2014 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
03.07.2014 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 13
24.04.2014 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
24.04.2014 Annex International Searching Authority 8
24.04.2014 Claims International Searching Authority 3
24.04.2014 Description International Searching Authority 25
24.04.2014 Drawings International Searching Authority 5