Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2988765


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2020 [2020/12]
07.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2020 [2020/11]
31.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2020 [2020/10]
24.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2020 [2020/09]
17.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2020  [2020/08]
31.05.2019 (Expected) grant published on  03.07.2019  [2019/27]
28.05.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.02.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.01.2019 Change - classification published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
18.01.2019 Change - classification published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
20.06.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.03.2018 First examination report
03.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.07.2016 Amendment by applicant
01.07.2016 Change - extension states published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
04.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.01.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
29.01.2016 Request for examination filed published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
27.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
05.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.2015 Change - representative
18.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
31.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication