Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2988765

EP2988765 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MIXTURE OF NEUTRAL OLIGOSACCHARIDES EXTRACTED FROM FLAXSEED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université De Reims Champagne-Ardenne
Villa Douce 9 Boulevard de la Paix
51100 Reims / FR
For all designated states
Centre Valorisation Glucides Prod Nat
33
Avenue Paul Claudel
80480 Dury / FR
For all designated states
Universite de Rouen
1, rue Thomas Becket
76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR
For all designated states
Vandeputte Oleochemicals
Boulevard Industriel 120
7700 Mouscron / BE
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[2019/27]
Former [2016/09]For all designated states
Université De Reims Champagne-Ardenne
Villa Douce 9 Boulevard de la Paix
51100 Reims / FR
For all designated states
Centre Valorisation Glucides Prod Nat
33
Avenue Paul Claudel
80480 Dury / FR
For all designated states
Universite de Rouen
1, rue Thomas Becket
76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR
For all designated states
Vandeputte Oleochemicals
Boulevard Industriel 120
7700 Mouscron / BE
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MAQUART, François
39bis
rue des Moissons
F-51100 Reims / FR
02 / BELLON, Georges
28
Rue Arlette Rémia-Coudron
F-51100 Reims / FR
03 / MARCHAL, Claire
1 rue Louis Neel
F-67200 STRASBOURG / FR
04 / DUCATEL, Hélène
2
Rue de Bonvillers
F-60120 Beauvoir / FR
05 / DUPUIS, Olivier
54
Rue du Maréchal Joffre
F-62270 Frevent / FR
06 / PICTON, Luc
10
Avenue des Poiriers
F-76530 Grand Couronne / FR
07 / LECERF, Didier
Hameau Ennecuit
F-76750 Bosc Roger Sur Buchy / FR
08 / FORBICE, Renauld
920
Chemin du Dandarelet
F-83300 Draguignan / FR
 [2016/09]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[2019/27]
Former [2016/09]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
Application number, filing date14729387.224.04.2014
[2016/09]
WO2014FR50994
Priority number, dateFR2013005371824.04.2013         Original published format: FR 1353718
[2016/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014174220
Date:30.10.2014
Language:FR
[2014/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2988765
Date:02.03.2016
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2988765
Date:03.07.2019
Language:FR
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/55, A61K8/73, A61K8/97, A61Q19/08, A61K31/702, A61P17/02
[2019/08]
Former International [2016/09]A61K36/55, A61K8/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MISCHUNG VON NEUTRALEN OLIGOSACCHARIDEN AUS FLACHSSAMEN[2016/09]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MIXTURE OF NEUTRAL OLIGOSACCHARIDES EXTRACTED FROM FLAXSEED[2016/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION D'UN MÉLANGE D'OLIGOSACCHARIDES NEUTRES EXTRAITS DE GRAINES DE LIN[2016/09]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2015National basic fee paid 
18.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/09]
18.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2019Fee for grant paid
24.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/11]AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
Former [2020/09]CZ03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
NO03.10.2019
Former [2020/08]LT03.07.2019
NO03.10.2019
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2008043944  (SILAB SA [FR], et al) [ID] 1-19 * page 7, paragraphs 1,2; example -; claim 11; table - *;
 [I]WO9316707  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB]) [I] 8-19 * page 5, lines 25-34; example 3; claim 8 *;
 [XI]  - KARINE GUILLOUX ET AL, "Production of Arabinoxylan-oligosaccharides from Flaxseed ( Linum usitatissimum )", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20091209), vol. 57, no. 23, doi:10.1021/jf902212z, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 11308 - 11313, XP055095419 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [I] 8-19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf902212z
 [I]  - WOJTASIK W ET AL, "The significance of flax fibre pectin in the extracellular matrix remodelling of wound healing process", FEBS JOURNAL, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, LONDON, GB, vol. 279, no. Suppl. 1, doi:10.1111/J.1742-4658.2010.08705.X, ISSN 1742-464X, (20120901), page 72, (20120830), XP009175407 [I] 8-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1742-4658.2010.08705.x
by applicantWO9924009
 US2007293433
 US2004097464
 WO2008043944