Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2967886

EP2967886 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR PATELLAR RESURFACING TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer Knee Creations, Inc.
841 Springdale Drive
Exton, PA 19341 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SHARKEY, Peter F.
615 Creighton Road
Villanova, Pennsylvania 19085 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/03]
Application number, filing date14729495.313.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US25452
Priority number, dateUS201361784609P14.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361784609 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014159919
Date:02.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2967886
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38, A61F2/30
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR EINE KNIESCHEIBENERNEUERUNGSBEHANDLUNG[2016/03]
English:METHODS AND DEVICES FOR PATELLAR RESURFACING TREATMENT[2016/03]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE RECONSTRUCTION PATELLAIRE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase13.10.2015National basic fee paid 
13.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
16.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[I]EP0812581  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROFESSIONAL [US]) [I] 1-9 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 5; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4964867  (BOGER JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2012078653  (ZIMMER INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008177394  (CHAUHAN SANDEEP K [GB]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0066]; figures 20,21,23 *