Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2991881

EP2991881 - INTERIOR TRAIN COMPONENTS HAVING LOW SMOKE AND LOW HEAT RELEASE, AND METHODS OF THEIR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[2019/44]
Former [2016/51]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Former [2016/10]For all designated states
SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SYBERT, Paul Dean
1 Lexan Lane
Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US
02 / VAN DER MEE, Mark Adrianus Johannes
Plasticslaan 1
NL-4612PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
03 / ASSINK, Roland Sebastian
Plasticslaan 1
NL-4612PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
04 / VAN DE GRAMPEL, Robert Dirk
Plasticslaan 1
NL-4612PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
 [2016/10]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2019/44]
Former [2016/10]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners (DE)
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14730632.828.04.2014
[2016/10]
WO2014US35660
Priority number, dateUS20131387470001.05.2013         Original published format: US201313874700
[2016/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014179209
Date:06.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2991881
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014
[2016/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2991881
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:B61D33/00, C08K5/00, C08K5/53, C08L69/00, C08L79/08, C08L83/10
[2016/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUGINNENKOMPONENTEN MIT NIEDRIGER RAUCH- UND WÄRMEABGABE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2016/10]
English:INTERIOR TRAIN COMPONENTS HAVING LOW SMOKE AND LOW HEAT RELEASE, AND METHODS OF THEIR MANUFACTURE[2016/10]
French:ÉLÉMENTS D'HABITACLE DE TRAIN À FAIBLE DÉGAGEMENT DE FUMÉE ET DE CHALEUR, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION[2016/10]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2015National basic fee paid 
06.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/10]
20.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2019Fee for grant paid
19.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US2007066737  (GALLUCCI ROBERT R [US], et al) [X] 1-49 * paragraph [0072] * * examples 14-16; table 5 *
by applicantUS6072011
 US3972902
 US4455410