EP2997124 - ENZYME BASED PRODUCTS FOR CAR WASHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRA-BER S.r.l. Corso Vercelli, 57 20144 Milano / IT | [2023/35] |
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states Fra-Ber S.r.l. Via M.K. Gandhi 24051 Antegnate (BG) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTON, Franco c/o FRA-BER S.R.L. Via M.K. Gandhi 33-35 I-24051 Antegnate (Bergamo) / IT | 02 /
BERTON, Gabriele c/o FRA-BER S.R.L. Via M.K. Gandhi 33-35 I-24051 Antegnate (Bergamo) / IT | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Trupiano, Federica Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 14730984.3 | 13.05.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014IB00712 | Priority number, date | IT2013MI00782 | 13.05.2013 Original published format: IT MI20130782 | [2016/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014184633 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2997124 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/38, C11D3/386, C11D11/00 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
C11D3/386 (EP,RU,US);
C11D1/83 (RU);
C11D3/381 (EP,US);
C11D3/38627 (US);
C11D3/43 (RU);
C11D9/00 (RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | AUF ENZYMEN BASIERENDE PRODUKTE FÜR AUTOWASCHANLAGEN | [2016/12] | English: | ENZYME BASED PRODUCTS FOR CAR WASHES | [2016/12] | French: | PRODUITS À BASE D'ENZYME POUR LAVAGES DE VOITURE | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 28.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9425561 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * page 5, lines 3-13 * * page 6, lines 8-17, 29-34 * * example - * [I] 3,9; | [XI]GB2283982 (TOAD INNOVATIONS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,6,8,10 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 7 * * example - * * claim - * [I] 1-10; | [XI]WO9621716 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * page 3, lines 16-24 * * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 9 * * example 4 * * claim - * [I] 1-10; | [X]US6191092 (BRAGULLA SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * column 1, lines 5-8 ** example -; tables 1, 2 *; | [XI]US2005049166 (HUANG TSAO-CHIN CLARE [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 6] , [0 12] * * paragraphs [0058] - [0068]; example . * [I] 1-10 | Examination | US2004159342 | DE202008001532U | EP2554441 | US8388904 | WO2014106593 |