Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3003661

EP3003661 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BOG (BLACK) OAK WOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UAB "Grigo"
Zemaiciu g. 51-1
44186 Kaunas / LT
[2016/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GRIGAS, Vytautas
Vytauto g. 163
Garliava
LT-53203 Kauno r. sav. / LT
 [2016/15]
Representative(s)Pranevicius, Gediminas , et al
Law firm IP Forma
Uzupio g. 30
01203 Vilnius / LT
[2017/43]
Former [2016/15]Pranevicius, Gediminas
Law firm VARUL Konstitucijos pr. 7
09308 Vilnius / LT
Application number, filing date14731378.723.05.2014
[2016/15]
WO2014IB61670
Priority number, dateLT2013000005224.05.2013         Original published format: LT 2013052
[2016/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014188392
Date:27.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3003661
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014
[2016/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3003661
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:B27K3/08, B27K3/26, B27K5/02
[2016/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MOOREICHENHOLZ (SCHWARZEICHENHOLZ)[2016/15]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING BOG (BLACK) OAK WOOD[2016/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE BOIS DE CHÊNE DE TOURBIÈRE (NOIR)[2016/15]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2015National basic fee paid 
11.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/15]
06.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
31.05.2017Fee for grant paid
31.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2019/06]
Former [2018/52]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL25.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US3839073  (HILL R) [X] 1,6-8 [A] 2 [I] 3-5;
 [AD]US2002178608  (LEONOVS ALEKSANDRS [LV]) [AD] 1-8 * claim 1 *
by applicantUS2002178608
 GB152427