Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2992354

EP2992354 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR CHARACTERIZING AND AFFECTING MOBILE DEVICE LOCATION ACCURACY AND/OR UNCERTAINTY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/10]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Gengsheng
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / AKGUL, Ferit O.
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / RAMAN, Sundar
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1716 / US
04 / VEMPATI, Murthy S.
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / LAMBA, Gaurav
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/10]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/10]Wimmer, Hubert
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14731434.830.04.2014
[2016/10]
WO2014US36038
Priority number, dateUS201361817947P01.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361817947 P
US20131395831202.08.2013         Original published format: US201313958312
[2016/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014179399
Date:06.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2992354
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014
[2016/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2992354
Date:31.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W64/00, G01S5/02
[2017/01]
Former International [2016/10]G01S5/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG UND BEEINFLUSSUNG DER LOKALISIERUNGSGENAUIGKEIT UND/ODER -UNSICHERHEIT EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG[2016/10]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR CHARACTERIZING AND AFFECTING MOBILE DEVICE LOCATION ACCURACY AND/OR UNCERTAINTY[2016/10]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DESTINÉS À LA CARACTÉRISATION ET L'AFFECTATION D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE LOCATION ACCURACY AND/OR UNCERTAINTY[2016/10]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2015National basic fee paid 
22.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/10]
10.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2017Fee for grant paid
19.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)01.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.05.2017
CZ31.05.2017
DK31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
FI31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
IT31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
PL31.05.2017
RO31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SE31.05.2017
SI31.05.2017
SK31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/25]AT31.05.2017
CZ31.05.2017
DK31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
FI31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
IT31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
PL31.05.2017
RO31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SE31.05.2017
SI31.05.2017
SK31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT31.05.2017
CZ31.05.2017
DK31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
FI31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
IT31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
PL31.05.2017
RO31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SE31.05.2017
SK31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT31.05.2017
CZ31.05.2017
DK31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
FI31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
RO31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SE31.05.2017
SK31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT31.05.2017
DK31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
FI31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SE31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
FI31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
NL31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SE31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
FI31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SE31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT31.05.2017
ES31.05.2017
FI31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US2011090122  (THOMSON MARTIN [AU] ET AL) [A] 1-80 * paragraphs [0043] - [0075] *;
 [A]US2009061779  (GURNEY DAVID P [US] ET AL) [A] 1-80 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004160909  (SHEYNBLAT LEONID [US]) [A] 1-80 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6456956  (XIONG LI [US]) [A] 1-80 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010141885  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; ISCHE MARC A [US]; HATAMI AHMAD [US]; HESHMATI ARDA) [A] 1-80 * the whole document *