Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3000259

EP3000259 - BEACON TRANSMISSION OVER UNLICENSED SPECTRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/13]
Inventor(s)01 / BHUSHAN, Naga
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / MALLADI, Durga, Prasad
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / WEI, Yongbin
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / GAAL, Peter
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / LUO, Tao
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / JI, Tingfang
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
07 / HORN, Gavin, Bernard
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
08 / CHEN, Wanshi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
09 / DAMNJANOVIC, Aleksandar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/13]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2018/09]
Former [2016/13]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14731883.620.05.2014
[2016/13]
WO2014US38768
Priority number, dateUS201361825459P20.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361825459 P
US20141428164119.05.2014         Original published format: US201414281641
[2016/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014189914
Date:27.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3000259
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014
[2016/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3000259
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/10
[2016/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BAKENÜBERTRAGUNG ÜBER UNLIZENSIERTES SPEKTRUM[2016/13]
English:BEACON TRANSMISSION OVER UNLICENSED SPECTRUM[2016/13]
French:TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX DE BALISE DANS UN SPECTRE SANS LICENCE[2016/13]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2015National basic fee paid 
16.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/13]
07.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.01.2018Fee for grant paid
10.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.01.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
22.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
IE20.05.2018
LU20.05.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
IE20.05.2018
LU20.05.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
LU20.05.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]WO2012037236  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,11,12,15,19,21,22,25,29,31,32,35,36,39,45,47,50,56,58,61,67,69 * page 24, line 16, paragraph [0091] - page 25, line 19 * * figure 19A * * page 24, line 8, paragraph [0091] - line 9 * * page 25, paragraph [0094] - page 26 * [A] 6,16,26,40-42,51-53,62-64,70-72 [Y] 3,4,13,14,23,24,33,34,37,38,48,49,59,60 [I] 7,8,17,18,27,28,43,44,54,55,65,66;
 [YA]EP1441468  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 3,4,13,14,23,24,33,34,37,38,48,49,59,60 * page 6, line 52, paragraph [0055] * * page 6, line 38, paragraph [0055] - line 48 * [A] 1,2,5-9,11,12,15-19,21,22,25-29,31,32,35,36,39-45,47,50-56,58,61-67,69-72;
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.331 V11.2.0, (20121219), vol. RAN WG2, XP002729254 [A] 1-72 * page 24, paragraph 5.2.1.1 - page 25, paragraph 5.2.1.2 * * MasterInformationBlock; page 130 - page 131 * * SystemInformationBlockType1; page 154 - page 156 * * page 164, paragraph 6.3.1 - page 181 * * Document consists of pages 24-25,130-131,154-156,164-181. *