Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2981497

EP2981497 - CARGO BOX BLOCK ARRANGEMENT FOR FORKLIFT TRUCK WITH FORKLIFT MEANS AND RELATED FORKLIFT TRUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Anty S.r.l.
Via Tatarella n. 6
70020 Bitetto (BARI) / IT
[2016/06]
Inventor(s)01 / FINIZIO Giampiero
Via LB. Alberti 4
I-70010 - Casamassima BA / IT
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)Cacciamani, Clizia
Innova & Partners Via Cola di Rienzo, 265
00192 Roma / IT
[2016/06]
Application number, filing date14732424.831.03.2014
[2016/06]
WO2014IT00090
Priority number, dateIT2013NA0001902.04.2013         Original published format: IT NA20130019
[2016/06]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014162323
Date:09.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2981497
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B66F9/12, B66F9/18, B66F9/14
[2019/09]
Former International [2017/31]B66F9/12, B66F9/18, B66F9/14, A61M1/14
Former International [2016/06]B66F9/12, B66F9/18, B66F9/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
TitleGerman:FRACHTBEHÄLTERBLOCKANORDNUNG FÜR GABELSTAPLER MIT GABELSTAPLERVORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGER GABELSTAPLER[2016/06]
English:CARGO BOX BLOCK ARRANGEMENT FOR FORKLIFT TRUCK WITH FORKLIFT MEANS AND RELATED FORKLIFT TRUCK[2016/06]
French:AGENCEMENT DE BLOC DE CAISSE DE MARCHANDISES POUR CHARIOT ÉLÉVATEUR À FOURCHE COMPRENANT DES MOYENS DE FOURCHE ET CHARIOT ÉLÉVATEUR À FOURCHE ASSOCIÉ[2016/06]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2015National basic fee paid 
30.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/06]
19.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201603   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2971662  (DUNHAM ELMER J) [X] 1-3,11-15 * the whole document * [A] 4-10;
 [XA]US2003091419  (HAAS RICHARD P [US]) [X] 1-3,11 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1-6 * [A] 4-10,12-15;
 [A]US4272217  (SEFCIK ROBERT) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE202004006091U  (TRANSORT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE8005629U  (KAUP GMBH) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantIT1354640
 IT1383934
 IT266934U
 ITBA20110013U