Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2999437

EP2999437 - HEATED BOLT FOR MODULAR HIP STEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw IN 46580 / US
[2016/13]
Inventor(s)01 / BORRIES, Paul
1881 N. Airport Rd.
Columbia City, Indiana 46725 / US
 [2016/13]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/13]
Application number, filing date14732484.215.05.2014
[2016/13]
WO2014US38202
Priority number, dateUS201361826742P23.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361826742 P
[2016/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014189765
Date:27.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2999437
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014
[2016/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/36, A61F2/30
[2016/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/13]
TitleGerman:BEHEIZTER BOLZEN FÜR MODULARES HÜFTSYSTEM[2016/13]
English:HEATED BOLT FOR MODULAR HIP STEM[2016/13]
French:ÉCROU CHAUFFÉ POUR TIGE DE PROTHÈSE MODULAIRE DE HANCHE[2016/13]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2015National basic fee paid 
22.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/13]
08.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[IY]US2005137711  (SOUTHWORTH CARLETON B [US], et al) [I] 12-20 * paragraphs [0024] , [0026] , [0032] , [0034] , [0045] * [Y] 1-11;
 [XY]WO9513757  (KIRSCHNER MEDICAL CORP [US]) [X] 12 * page 12 * [Y] 1-11;
 [A]US2012130502  (PODOLSKY ANATOL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0390] - paragraph [0391] *;
 [A]JPH09317734  (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH09216133  (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 6,15 * abstract *;
 [A]GB662302  (SVENSKA TURBINFAB AB) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 40 - line 46 *;
 [A]GB1451443  (REYROLLE PARSONS LTD) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 12 - line 19 *