Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3017661

EP3017661 - A METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMMUNICATION DEVICE IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK, A COMMUNICATION DEVICE, A LUMINAIRE EQUIPPED WITH SUCH COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
22.11.2019Opposition rejectedpublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Signify Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 48
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2019/11]
Former [2018/50]For all designated states
Philips Lighting Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 48
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2016/34]For all designated states
Philips Lighting Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2016/19]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / GARCIA MORCHON, Oscar
c/o High Tech Campus 45
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2017/33]
Former [2016/19]01 / GARCIA MORCHON, Oscar
High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Representative(s)van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus , et al
Signify Netherlands B.V.
Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 7
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/14]van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus , et al
Philips Lighting B.V.
Philips Lighting Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2016/19]van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus , et al
Philips Lighting B.V.
Philips Lighting Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date14733638.227.06.2014
[2016/19]
WO2014EP63681
Priority number, dateEP2013017523605.07.2013         Original published format: EP 13175236
[2016/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015000803
Date:08.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3017661
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015
[2016/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3017661
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W84/20, H04L29/08, H04M1/725, H04W76/02, H05B37/02
[2016/46]
Former International [2016/19]H05B37/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG, MIT SOLCH EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG AUSGESTATTETE LEUCHTE[2016/19]
English:A METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMMUNICATION DEVICE IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK, A COMMUNICATION DEVICE, A LUMINAIRE EQUIPPED WITH SUCH COMMUNICATION DEVICE[2016/19]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION, LUMINAIRE ÉQUIPÉ DUDIT DISPOSITIF[2016/46]
Former [2016/19]PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION, LUMINAIRE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION
Entry into regional phase05.02.2016National basic fee paid 
05.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/19]
05.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2017Fee for grant paid
21.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.04.2018Observations by third parties
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.01.2018   
Molnia, David
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Molnia, David
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Fünf Höfe
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
 [2018/07]
23.01.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.06.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.06.2019Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/52]
18.06.2019Date of oral proceedings
07.08.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.08.2019Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.06.2014
AT05.04.2017
CY05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
MK05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE27.06.2017
LU27.06.2017
MT27.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/48]HU27.06.2014
AT05.04.2017
CY05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE27.06.2017
LU27.06.2017
MT27.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2019/31]HU27.06.2014
AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE27.06.2017
LU27.06.2017
MT27.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/43]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE27.06.2017
LU27.06.2017
MT27.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE27.06.2017
LU27.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/23]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
IE27.06.2017
LU27.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
LU27.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL05.04.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005097162  (BUDIKE LOTHAR E JR [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053]; figures 11,13 *;
 [X]US2011178650  (PICCO MICHAEL L [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0087]; figure 6 *
OppositionUS6909705
 US8478360
 US2012020060
 US2002093956