Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2991726

EP2991726 - MULTI-BRANCH STIMULATION ELECTRODE FOR SUBCUTANEOUS FIELD STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alfred E. Mann Foundation for Scientific Research
P.O. Box 905
Santa Clarita, CA 91380 / US
[2016/10]
Inventor(s)01 / SHELTON, Brian, M.
c/o Axonics Modulation Technologies Inc.
16411 Scientific Way
Suite 200
Irvine, CA 92613 / US
02 / HANSEN, Morten
c/o Alfred E. Mann Foundation for Scientific
Research
P.O. Box 905
Santa Clarita, CA 91380 / US
 [2016/10]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2016/10]
Application number, filing date14733760.405.05.2014
[2016/10]
WO2014US36850
Priority number, dateUS201361819441P03.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361819441 P
[2016/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014179811
Date:06.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2991726
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014
[2016/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2991726
Date:25.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/375, A61N1/36, A61N1/05
[2016/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRZWEIGIGE STIMULATIONSELEKTRODE FÜR SUBKUTANE FELDSTIMULATION[2016/10]
English:MULTI-BRANCH STIMULATION ELECTRODE FOR SUBCUTANEOUS FIELD STIMULATION[2016/10]
French:ELECTRODE DE STIMULATION À PLUSIEURS BRANCHES POUR STIMULATION EN CHAMP SOUS-CUTANÉ[2016/10]
Entry into regional phase19.11.2015National basic fee paid 
19.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/10]
20.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2018Fee for grant paid
13.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
DK25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
ES25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
IT25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
MC25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SI25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
SM25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
[2020/07]
Former [2019/37]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
DK25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
ES25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
IT25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SI25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
SM25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
DK25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
ES25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
IT25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
SM25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/23]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
ES25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
IT25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
IT25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
IT25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
NO25.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL25.07.2018
Cited inInternational search[IY]US2002116042  (BOLING C LANCE [US]) [I] 1-3,5-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0035] , [0041] , [0054] * [Y] 4,17-28;
 [IY]US6427086  (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US] ET AL) [I] 1 * abstract * * column 12, line 53 - column 14, line 35 * [Y] 17,23;
 [IY]US2003078633  (FIRLIK ANDREW D [US] ET AL) [I] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0036] * [Y] 17,23;
 [Y]US2008132961  (JAAX KRISTEN N [US] ET AL) [Y] 4,17-28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0024] , [0025] , [0036] - [0038] *;
 [A]US2012016447  (ZHU CHANGFANG [US] ET AL) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009105785  (WEI XUAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009088816  (HAREL TAMI [IL] ET AL) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007073357  (ROONEY ETHAN A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5143089  (ALT ECKHARD [DE]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2012130465