Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2997337

EP2997337 - SYSTEM FOR THE ESTIMATION OF ONE OR MORE PARAMETERS RELATED TO THE LOAD OF A VEHICLE, PARTICULARLY OF THE ABSOLUTE VALUE AND THE DISTRIBUTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E-Novia S.r.l.
Via San Martino 12
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2016/12]For all designated states
E-Novia S.r.l.
Piazzale G. Cesare 9
20145 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / SAVARESI, Sergio, Matteo
Largo Paolo Sarpi 8
I-26100 Cremona / IT
02 / BOTTELLI, Stefano
Via Filzi 8
I-21100 Varese / IT
03 / TANELLI, Mara
Via Saragat 1
I-26900 Lodi / IT
04 / BONIOLO, Ivo
Via Comasinella 97
I-20183 Bovisio Masciago (MB) / IT
 [2016/12]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2016/12]Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti
Ing. C. Gregorj S.p.A.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date14734905.414.05.2014
[2016/12]
WO2014IB61418
Priority number, dateIT2013MI0080216.05.2013         Original published format: IT MI20130802
[2016/12]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014184747
Date:20.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2997337
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014
[2016/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01G19/08
[2016/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/12]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR MESSUNG EINES ODER MEHRERER PARAMETER BEZÜGLICH DER LADUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS, INSBESONDERE DES ABSOLUTWERTES UND DER VERTEILUNG DAVON[2016/12]
English:SYSTEM FOR THE ESTIMATION OF ONE OR MORE PARAMETERS RELATED TO THE LOAD OF A VEHICLE, PARTICULARLY OF THE ABSOLUTE VALUE AND THE DISTRIBUTION THEREOF[2016/12]
French:SYSTÈME POUR L'ESTIMATION D'UN OU PLUSIEURS PARAMÈTRES LIÉS À LA CHARGE D'UN VÉHICULE, ET EN PARTICULIER DE LA VALEUR ABSOLUE ET DE SA RÉPARTITION[2016/12]
Entry into regional phase19.10.2015National basic fee paid 
19.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/12]
01.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
07.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[I]US2007017727  (MESSIH DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 17] , [0019] , [0 84] , [0 90] , [0 91] , [0103] - [0109] *;
 [I]EP2502759  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [I] 1 * claims 1,12 *;
 [I]US2009235724  (RYU JIHAN [US], et al) [I] 1 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [I]EP2090874  (UNIV TOKYO NAT UNIV CORP [JP]) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0174] , [0205]; figures 3,4,6; claim 1 *