Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3008515

EP3008515 - VOLTAGE CONTROLLED OPTICAL DIRECTIONAL COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Optical Communications Wireless, Ltd
Golan Building
Airport City
70151 Lod / IL
[2016/16]
Inventor(s)01 / REUVEN, Rami
46 Hatizmoret St.
75573 Rishon Letzion / IL
 [2016/16]
Representative(s)Sturm, Christoph
Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unter den Eichen 5
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
[2016/16]
Application number, filing date14734911.212.06.2014
[2016/16]
WO2014IL50535
Priority number, dateUS201361834066P12.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361834066 P
US201361894129P22.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361894129 P
[2016/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014199384
Date:18.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3008515
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014
[2016/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/313, G02B6/125, H04J14/00
[2016/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/16]
TitleGerman:SPANNUNGSGESTEUERTER OPTISCHER RICHTKOPPLER[2016/16]
English:VOLTAGE CONTROLLED OPTICAL DIRECTIONAL COUPLER[2016/16]
French:COUPLEUR DIRECTIF OPTIQUE A COMMANDE EN TENSION[2016/16]
Entry into regional phase06.01.2016National basic fee paid 
06.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
06.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/16]
21.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/36]
24.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1241515  (TELEPHOTONICS INC [US] DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 2a,2b,2c *;
 [I]JP2007065227  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5278923  (NAZARATHY MOSHE [US] ET AL) [X] 1-20 * column 15, line 6 - column 16, line 45 * * column 25, line 10 - line 29 * * figure 15 *;
 [I]US2002085811  (KAMBE TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0203] * * figures 5,28 *;
 [A]EP0964290  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008144989  (SAKURAI TAKAO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US2005185884  (HAUS HERMANN A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]GB2095419  (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-20 * figure 6 *