Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3016568

EP3016568 - DEVICE FOR WASHING FLOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.03.2018  [2018/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SBD Superior Business Development AG
Drei Kreuzern 1
8840 Einsiedeln / CH
[2016/19]
Inventor(s)01 / HEINZER, Veit Michael
Via Adige, 8
I-36020 POVE DEL GRAPPA / IT
[N/P]
Former [2016/19]01 / HEINZER, Veit Michael
Contra' Corte S. Eusebio 28
I-36061 Bassano Del Grappa / IT
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/19]
Application number, filing date14736348.501.07.2014
[2016/19]
WO2014EP63919
Priority number, dateIT2013VR0015302.07.2013         Original published format: IT VR20130153
[2016/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015000878
Date:08.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3016568
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015
[2016/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:A47L13/256, A47L13/14
[2016/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM WASCHEN VON FUSSBÖDEN[2016/19]
English:DEVICE FOR WASHING FLOORS[2016/19]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LAVAGE DE SOLS[2016/19]
Entry into regional phase28.01.2016National basic fee paid 
28.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/19]
16.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/12]
03.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2982757  (PAUL MASQUIN ETS [FR]) [A] 1-13 * pages 8-10; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO2010116089  (ELYSEES BALZAC FINANCIERE [FR]; BOUTEILLER SEBASTIEN [FR]; CORBIN JEAN) [A] 1-13 * pages 4-7; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE102009037071  (LEIFHEIT AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE202011005690U  (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0037] - [0041]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE102009041640  (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0040] - [0049]; figure -; claim - *
by applicantDE19648956