EP3013850 - GLYCOGEN SYNTHASE KINASE-3 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd. P.O. Box 39296 6139201 Tel-Aviv / IL | For all designated states Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2018/08] |
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd. P.O. Box 39296 6139201 Tel-Aviv / IL | ||
For all designated states Yeda Research and Development Co., Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELDAR-FINKELMAN, Hagit 61 Emek Ayalon Street 6083561 Shoham / IL | 02 /
EISENSTEIN, Miriam 7 Paldi Street 7624807 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
LICHT-MURAVA, Avital 73 Einstein Street 6910226 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/18] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14736462.4 | 24.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014IL50567 | Priority number, date | US201361838347P | 24.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361838347 P | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014207743 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3013850 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3013850 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C07K7/08 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (US);
A61K38/095 (EP,US);
A61K38/10 (EP,US);
G16B15/00 (EP,US);
G16B15/30 (EP,US);
G16B35/00 (EP,US);
G16B35/20 (EP,US);
G16C20/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLYCOGENSYNTHASEKINASE-3-INHIBITOREN | [2016/18] | English: | GLYCOGEN SYNTHASE KINASE-3 INHIBITORS | [2016/18] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE GLYCOGÈNE SYNTHASE KINASE-3 | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 05.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2014 | AL | 25.07.2018 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | MT | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | PT | 25.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 24.06.2014 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.06.2014 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2004052404 (UNIV TEL AVIV FUTURE TECH DEV [IL], et al) [ID] 1-32,34-37,39-50,56 * Abstract; claims; p.14, l. 15 *; | [ID]WO2012101599 (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al) [ID] 1-32,34-37,39-50,56* Abstract; claims; p. 3, l. 2; p. 53, l. 10-p. 55, l. 9. * | Examination | WO0149709 | WO2004108948 | WO2005012329 | WO2011149909 | by applicant | US5013830 | US5149797 | US5220007 | US5256775 | US5366878 | US5403711 | US5491133 | US5565350 | US5623065 | US5652355 | US5652356 | WO9741854 | US5700922 | WO9816528 | US5861266 | WO0149709 | US6326174 | US2002147146 | WO2004052404 | US6780625 | WO2005000192 | US7378432 | WO2012101599 | WO2012101601 | - BHAT ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (2004), vol. 89, pages 1313 - 7 | - COHEN, P.; GOEDERT, M., NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2004), vol. 3, pages 479 - 87 | - MEIJER ET AL., TRENDS PHARMACOL SCI, (2004), vol. 25, pages 471 - 80 | - ELDAR-FINKELMAN ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, vol. 1804, pages 598 - 603 | - MARTINEZ, A.; PEREZ, D. I., J. ALZHEIMERS DIS., (2008), vol. 15, pages 181 - 91 | - KERKELA ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2008), vol. 118, pages 3609 - 18 | - DROUCHEAU ET AL., BBRC, (2004), vol. 1700, pages 139 - 140 | - OJO ET AL., ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (2008), pages 37107 - 3717 | - WRAY ET AL., BIOCHEM SOC TRANS, (2010), pages 1027 - 32 | - PLOTKIN ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2003), pages 974 - 980 | - WOODGETT; COHEN, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1984), vol. 788, pages 339 - 47 | - FIOL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 14042 - 8 | - DAJANI ET AL., CELL, (2001), vol. 105, pages 721 - 32 | - TER HAAR ET AL., NATURE STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 8, pages 593 - 6 | - KAIDANOVICH-BEILIN; ELDAR-FINKELMAN, J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2005), vol. 316, pages 17 - 24 | - RAO ET AL., DIABETOLOGIA, (2007), vol. 50, pages 452 - 60 | - KIM ET AL., NEURON, (2006), vol. 52, pages 981 - 96 | - CHEN ET AL., FASEB J, (2004), vol. 18, pages 1162 - 4 | - KAIDANOVICH-BEILIN ET AL., BIOL. PSYCHIATRY, (2004), vol. 55, pages 781 - 4 | - SHAPIRA ET AL., MOL. CELL NEUROSCI., (2007), vol. 34, pages 571 - 7 | - ILOUZ ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 281, pages 30621 - 30 | - LICHT-MURAVA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2011), vol. 408, pages 366 - 378 | - LIBERMAN, Z.; ELDAR- FINKELMAN, H., J. BIOL. CLIENT., (2005), vol. 280, pages 4422 - 8 | - LIBERMAN ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (2008), vol. 294, pages E1169 - 77 | - BERTRAND ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2003), vol. 333, pages 393 - 407 | - PALOMO ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (20120223), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 1645 - 61 | - KAIDANOVICH-BEILIN; ELDAR-FINKELMAN, J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2005), vol. 3.16, pages 17 - 24 | - LIBERMAN, Z.; ELDAR-FINKELMAN, H., J. BIOL. CHENI., (2005), vol. 280, pages 4422 - 8 | - LIBERMAN ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (2008), vol. 294, pages 169 - 77 | - CARSON, M., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1997), vol. 277, page 25 | - JONES, TA. ET AL., ACTA CRYSTALLOGR, (1991), vol. A47, page 110 | - KRAULIS, J., APPL CRYSTALLOGR., (1991), vol. 24, page 946 | - MUNSHI CB; GRAEFF R; LEE HC, J BIOL CHENI, (20021220), vol. 277, no. 51, pages 49453 - 8 | - HUTVAGNER; ZAMORE, CURR. OPIN. GENETICS AND DEVELOPMENT, (2002), vol. 12, pages 225 - 232 | - SANTORO, S.W.; JOYCE, G.F., PROC. NATL, ACAD. SCI. USA, page 199 | - KHACHIGIAN, LM CURR OPIN MOL THER, (2002), vol. 4, pages 119 - 21 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO. | - FINGL ET AL., The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (1975), page L | - RADHAKRISHNAN ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 91, no. 6, pages 741 - 752 | - VAN DER SPOEL, J. COMPUT. CHENI., (2005), vol. 26, pages 1701 - 18 | - LINDAHL ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MODELING, (2001), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 306 - 317 | - BERCHANSKI ET AL., PROTEINS, (2004), vol. 351, pages 309 - 26 | - KOWALSMAN; EISENSTEIN, PROTEINS, (2009), vol. 77, pages 297 - 318 | - SAURA ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2005), vol. 25, no. 29, pages 6755 - 6764 | - OAKLEY ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2006), vol. 26, no. 40, pages 10129 - 10140 |