Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3019348

EP3019348 - LOW-NOISE TREAD FOR HEAVY VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
23 place des Carmes-Déchaux
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
[2018/44]
Former [2017/29]For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
12 Cours Sablon
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
Former [2016/20]For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
12 Cours Sablon
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
For all designated states
Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A.
Route Louis Braille 10
1763 Granges-Paccot / CH
Inventor(s)01 / QUANTINET, Benjamin
Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin
23 place des Carmes-Dechaux
DGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux
F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
02 / MARLIER, Fabien
Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin
23 place des Carmes-Dechaux
DGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux
F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
 [2016/20]
Representative(s)Diernaz, Christian
Manufacture Française des
Pneumatiques Michelin
CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23, place des Carmes-Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
[2019/39]
Former [2016/20]Diernaz, Christian
M. F. P. Michelin
23, place des Carmes Dechaux
DGD/PI-F35-Ladoux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date14736832.808.07.2014
[2016/20]
WO2014EP64642
Priority number, dateFR2013005674209.07.2013         Original published format: FR 1356742
[2016/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015004150
Date:15.01.2015
Language:FR
[2015/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3019348
Date:18.05.2016
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015
[2016/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3019348
Date:25.09.2019
Language:FR
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/11
[2016/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:RAUSCHARME LAUFFLÄCHE FÜR SCHWERLASTFAHRZEUGE[2016/20]
English:LOW-NOISE TREAD FOR HEAVY VEHICLES[2016/20]
French:BANDE DE ROULEMENT POUR POIDS LOURD À BRUIT RÉDUIT[2019/21]
Former [2016/20]BANDE DE ROULEMENT POUR POIDS LOURD À BRUIT RÉDUIT.
Entry into regional phase09.02.2016National basic fee paid 
09.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
09.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/20]
02.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2019Fee for grant paid
13.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP1304239  (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE TECH [IT]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0012]; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 3-8
ExaminationEP2371582
 EP1207058
by applicantJPH03271003