Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3016636

EP3016636 - METHODS AND COMPOUNDS FOR PREVENTING OSTEOARTHRITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University College Cardiff Consultants Limited
Dr Philip Barnes
30-36 Newport Road
Cardiff
South Glamorgan CF24 0DE / GB
[2016/19]
Inventor(s)01 / MASON, Deborah
Yew Tree Cottage
Checkley
Hereford Hereford and Worcester HR1 4ND / GB
02 / BONNET, Cleo
40 Burlington Terrace
Cardiff CF5 1GG / GB
 [2016/19]
Representative(s)Myint, Julie Marie
Symbiosis IP Limited
Cardiff MediCentre
Heath Park
Cardiff CF14 4UJ / GB
[2020/01]
Former [2016/19]Fyles, Julie Marie
Symbiosis IP Limited
Basepoint Business Centre
Vale Business Park
Crab Apple Way, Evesham
Worcestershire WR11 1GP / GB
Application number, filing date14736940.903.07.2014
[2016/19]
WO2014GB52030
Priority number, dateGB2013001198404.07.2013         Original published format: GB 201311984
[2016/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015001349
Date:08.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3016636
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015
[2016/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3016636
Date:01.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/08, A61K31/498, A61K45/06
[2016/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VERBINDUNGEN ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON OSTEOARTHRITIS[2016/19]
English:METHODS AND COMPOUNDS FOR PREVENTING OSTEOARTHRITIS[2016/19]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSÉS POUR LA PRÉVENTION DE L'OSTÉO-ARTHRITE[2016/19]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2015National basic fee paid 
02.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/19]
08.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2019Fee for grant paid
20.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
05.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US2013165429  (RAY II JAY RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 13-17,25 * the whole document, in particular paragraph 0014 *;
 [X]US6559293  (ALMARSSON OERN [US], et al) [X] 13-17,25 * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0146] *;
 [A]WO2010128977  (SOLUPRIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013059634  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *
 [I]  - SLUKA K A ET AL, "An experimental arthritis model in rats: The effects of NMDA and non-NMDA antagonists on aspartate and glutamate release in the dorsal horn", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, LIMERICK, IE, vol. 149, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0304-3940(93)90357-Q, ISSN 0304-3940, (19930104), pages 99 - 102, (19930104), XP024362124 [I] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3940(93)90357-Q
 [I]  - SLUKA K A ET AL, "Spinal cord amino acid release and content in an arthritis model: the effects of pretreatment with non-NMDA, NMDA, and NK1 receptor antagonists", BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 627, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0006-8993(93)90752-9, ISSN 0006-8993, (19931105), pages 89 - 103, (19931105), XP024282564 [I] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-8993(93)90752-9
 [I]  - SLUKA K A ET AL, "Centrally administered non-NMDA but not NMDA receptor antagonists block peripheral knee joint inflammation", PAIN, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 55, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0304-3959(93)90150-N, ISSN 0304-3959, (199311), pages 217 - 225, (19931101), XP024379879 [I] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(93)90150-N
Examination   - L.C. Stanfa ET AL, "The role of non-N-methyl-d-aspartate ionotropic glutamate receptors in the spinal transmission of nociception in normal animals and animals with carrageenan inflammation", NEUROSCIENCE, US, (19990801), vol. 93, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0306-4522(99)00310-3, ISSN 0306-4522, pages 1391 - 1398, XP055487455

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0306-4522(99)00310-3