Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3010970

EP3010970 - POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITION TO PRODUCE OPTICAL QUALITY PRODUCTS WITH HIGH QUALITY AND GOOD PROCESSABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[2019/38]
Former [2016/17]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FERNANDEZ, Ignacio Vic
Carretera Cartagena Alhama de Murcia Km 13
La Aljorra
30390 Cartagena / ES
02 / HERNANDEZ, David Del Agua
Carretera Cartagena Alhama de Murcia Km 13
La Aljorra
30390 Cartagena / ES
03 / RIJKEN, Cornelis Jan Maria
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
 [2016/17]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2016/17]
Application number, filing date14736999.518.06.2014
[2016/17]
WO2014IB62336
Priority number, dateEP2013038223621.06.2013         Original published format: EP 13382236
[2016/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014203173
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3010970
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014
[2016/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3010970
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/103, C08L69/00
[2016/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYCARBONATZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG OPTISCHER QUALITÄTSPRODUKTE MIT HOHER QUALITÄT UND GUTER VERARBEITBARKEIT[2016/17]
English:POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITION TO PRODUCE OPTICAL QUALITY PRODUCTS WITH HIGH QUALITY AND GOOD PROCESSABILITY[2016/17]
French:COMPOSITION DE POLYCARBONATE POUR PRODUIRE DES PRODUITS DE QUALITÉ OPTIQUE AVEC UNE QUALITÉ ÉLEVÉE ET UNE BONNE APTITUDE AU TRAITEMENT[2019/15]
Former [2016/17]COMPOSITION DE POLYCARBONATE POUR FABRIQUER DES PRODUITS OPTIQUES DE GRANDE QUALITÉ ET AYANT UNE BONNE APTITUDE AU TRAITEMENT
Entry into regional phase30.12.2015National basic fee paid 
30.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/17]
28.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2019Fee for grant paid
08.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2000143961  (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD) [A] 1-19 * examples 3-5,7; tables 1,2 *;
 [I]US7307114  (HACHIYA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-19 * claims 1,3 *;
 [A]US2012095139  (YOSHIDA SHU [JP], et al) [A] 1-19