Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3028345

EP3028345 - CONTACT ELEMENT FOR A PLUG ARRANGEMENT IN A BUS SYSTEM, MORE PARTICULARLY AN EXTERNALLY ROUTED BUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.12.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.01.2020  [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2016/23]
Inventor(s)01 / APORIUS, Stefan
Krefelder Weg 32
32758 Detmold / DE
02 / VAN GIESEN, Bernd
Bruchstr. 7
32756 Detmold / DE
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/05]
Former [2016/23]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14737273.411.07.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014EP64921
Priority number, dateDE201320103444U31.07.2013         Original published format: DE 202013103444 U
[2016/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015014591
Date:05.02.2015
Language:DE
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3028345
Date:08.06.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015
[2016/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3028345
Date:30.01.2019
Language:DE
[2019/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/11, H01R25/16, H01R12/70, // H01R13/18, H01R31/02
[2018/43]
Former International [2016/23]H01R12/70, H01R13/11, H01R25/16, H01R31/02, H01R13/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONTAKTELEMENT FÜR EINE STECKANORDNUNG EINES INSBESONDERE AUSSEN GEFÜHRTEN BUSSYSTEMS[2018/43]
English:CONTACT ELEMENT FOR A PLUG ARRANGEMENT IN A BUS SYSTEM, MORE PARTICULARLY AN EXTERNALLY ROUTED BUS SYSTEM[2016/23]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE CONTACT POUR ENSEMBLE ENFICHABLE D'UN SYSTÈME DE BUS GUIDÉ EN PARTICULIER À L'EXTÉRIEUR[2016/23]
Former [2016/23]KONTAKTELEMENT FÜR EINE STECKANORDNUNG EINES INSBESONDERE AUßEN GEFÜHRTEN BUSSYSTEMS
Entry into regional phase22.02.2016National basic fee paid 
22.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
16.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2018Fee for grant paid
11.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)31.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL30.01.2019
CZ30.01.2019
DK30.01.2019
EE30.01.2019
ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
IT30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RO30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
SK30.01.2019
SM30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/49]AL30.01.2019
CZ30.01.2019
DK30.01.2019
EE30.01.2019
ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
IT30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RO30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
SK30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/48]DK30.01.2019
ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
IT30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/46]ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
IT30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006091196  (BYRNE NORMAN R [US]) [X] 1,3-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0042] - [0045] * * figures 1-10 *;
 [X]US4553799  (DETERS PAUL M [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8,10 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 10 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]DE102007017593  (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0016] - [0024] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE2400509  (DAUT & RIETZ KG) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2048746  (TYCO ELECTRONICS NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19706943  (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US5588884  (RUDOY EDWARD [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US2005085140  (LAI YAW-HUEY [TW]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *