EP2943058 - STUMP CUTTER DISC WITH RECESSED TOOTH POCKETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vermeer Manufacturing Company 1210 Vermeer Road East Pella, IA 50219 / US | [2015/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINBERG, Clint 957 202nd Avenue Pella, IA 50219 / US | 02 /
HARTKE, Louis, C. 132 Terrace Drive Otley, IA 50214 / US | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2019/16] |
Former [2015/47] | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 14737718.8 | 09.01.2014 | [2015/47] | WO2014US10869 | Priority number, date | US201361751705P | 11.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361751705 P | US201414147277 | 03.01.2014 Original published format: US201414147277 | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014110253 | Date: | 17.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2943058 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2943058 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01G23/06 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
A01G23/067 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | A01G23/06, A01G23/00, A01B33/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STUMPFSCHNEIDERPLATTE MIT VERSENKTEN ZAHNTASCHEN | [2015/47] | English: | STUMP CUTTER DISC WITH RECESSED TOOTH POCKETS | [2015/47] | French: | DISQUE DE COUPE DE SOUCHE À POCHETTES DENTÉES RENFONCÉES | [2018/48] |
Former [2015/47] | DISQUE D'ÉLÉMENT DE COUPE DE SOUCHE À POCHETTES DENTÉES RENFONCÉES | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2014 | AL | 17.04.2019 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | HR | 17.04.2019 | IT | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | MK | 17.04.2019 | MT | 17.04.2019 | NL | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | RS | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | SM | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | NO | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | IE | 09.01.2020 | LU | 09.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.01.2014 | |
AL | 17.04.2019 | ||
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
MT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 09.01.2020 | ||
LU | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 09.01.2020 | ||
LU | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 17.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2009031877 (GILBERT SYLVAIN [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,10,11 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0038] * [A] 5-9,12-15 [I] 2,3; | [XAI]US2005166997 (SHINN RICKEY D [US]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0028] * [A] 5-9,12-15 [I] 2,3; | [A]US2008196791 (GOSSETT JOHNNY [US]) [A] 1,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6152201 (KURELEK JOHN [CA]) [A] 1,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010218851 (LEONARDI JOSEPH A [US], et al) [A] 1,12,13,15 * the whole document * * figures 56, 57 * | International search | [X]US2005166997 (SHINN, RICKEY D.); | [Y]US2008149224 (KAPPEL, GARY W. ET AL.); | [A]US2008190519 (GREEN, KEVIN J.); | [A]US2008245440 (PAUMIER, JAMES J.); | [A]US2012024425 (LEONARDI, JOSEPH ET AL.) | Examination | US2007125445 | by applicant | US6014996 | US7011124 | US6026781 | US6230770 | US2009031877 | US2005166997 |