Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2943453

EP2943453 - ETHYLENE SEPARATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lyondell Chemical Technology, L.P.
1221 McKinney, Suite 700
Lyondellbasell Tower
Houston, TX 77010 / US
For all designated states
Equistar Chemicals, LP.
1221 McKinney Street, Suite 700
Houston, TX 77010 / US
[2015/47]
Inventor(s)01 / SAWYER, Gary, A.
712 Centennial Avenue
Media, PA 19063 / US
02 / BRIDGES, Robert, S.
303 W. Spreading Oaks
Friendswood, TX 77546 / US
03 / COLEMAN, Steven, T.
5930 Bent Tree Court
Humble, TX 77346 / US
04 / HOOD, Allen David Jr.
4106 Village Corner Drive
Houston, TX 77059 / US
 [2015/47]
Representative(s)Sacco, Marco
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Donegani, 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
[2015/47]
Application number, filing date14738270.908.01.2014
[2015/47]
WO2014US10631
Priority number, dateUS20131373868510.01.2013         Original published format: US201313738685
[2015/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014110102
Date:17.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2943453
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014
[2015/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2943453
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR17.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07C6/04, C07C7/04, C07C11/04, C07C11/06
[2016/36]
Former International [2015/47]C07C7/04, C07C11/04, B01J19/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ETHYLEN-TRENNVERFAHREN[2015/47]
English:ETHYLENE SEPARATION PROCESS[2015/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION D'ÉTHYLÈNE[2015/47]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2015National basic fee paid 
16.07.2015Search fee paid 
16.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/47]
24.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2019Fee for grant paid
11.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/51]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/49]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2012095275  (COLEMAN STEVEN T [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * example 1 * [Y] 1-15;
 [I]US7525007  (SUMNER CHARLES [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 7, lines 12-19; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US2006004242  (VERMA VIJENDER K [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,7 *
International search[X]US2012095275  (COLEMAN STEVEN T [US], et al);
 [A]US2006161033  (CHODORGE JEAN-ALAIN [FR], et al);
 [A]US7525007  (SUMNER CHARLES [US]);
 [A]US8586813  (RAMACHANDRAN BALA [US], et al)