Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3011019

EP3011019 - POLYPEPTIDE HAVING THE CAPACITY TO FORM ALPHA-1,3 GLUCOSYL UNIT BRANCHINGS ON AN ACCEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut National de la Recherche Agronomique (INRA)
147, rue de l'Université
75338 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
For all designated states
Institut National des Sciences Appliquées de Toulouse
135 Avenue de Rangueil
31400 Toulouse / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
[2016/17]
Inventor(s)01 / REMAUD-SIMEON, Magali
1 rue Benjamin Charrié
F-31520 Ramonville / FR
02 / VUILLEMIN, Marlène
Appartement K11
245 route de Narbonne
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
03 / MOULIS, Claire
Lazières
F31390 Vieillevigne / FR
04 / MONSAN, Pierre
22 chemin de la Gravette
F-31700 Mondonville / FR
05 / MOREL, Sandrine
Château d'Auzeville
F-31320 Auzeville-Tolosane / FR
 [2016/17]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[2019/32]
Former [2016/17]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date14738375.617.06.2014
[2016/17]
WO2014EP01644
Priority number, dateFR2013000140217.06.2013         Original published format: FR 1301402
[2016/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014202208
Date:24.12.2014
Language:FR
[2014/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3011019
Date:27.04.2016
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014
[2016/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3011019
Date:07.08.2019
Language:FR
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/10
[2016/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYPEPTID MIT FÄHIGKEIT ZUR BILDUNG VON ALPHA-1,3-GLUCOSYLEINHEITSVERZWEIGUNGEN AUF EINEM AKZEPTOR[2016/17]
English:POLYPEPTIDE HAVING THE CAPACITY TO FORM ALPHA-1,3 GLUCOSYL UNIT BRANCHINGS ON AN ACCEPTOR[2016/17]
French:POLYPEPTIDE AYANT LA CAPACITE DE FORMER DES BRANCHEMENTS D'UNITES GLUCOSYLE EN ALPHA-1,3 SUR UN ACCEPTEUR[2016/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2016National basic fee paid 
18.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/17]
21.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
10.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2019Fee for grant paid
14.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:10.11.2016Request for further processing filed
10.11.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.12.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]  - HEE-KYOUNG KANG ET AL, "Directed evolution of a dextransucrase for increased constitutive activity and the synthesis of a highly branched dextran", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. B, ENZYMATIC, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20031201), vol. 26, no. 3-6, doi:10.1016/J.MOLCATB.2003.05.006, ISSN 1381-1177, pages 167 - 176, XP002720574 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 167, column r, line 8 - line 14 * * 2.1. Bacterial strains, vector, and culture conditions; page 168 * * 2.4. Purification of dextransucrase; page 169 * * 2.7. Analysis of branching of dextran; page 170 * * page 174, column r, line 10 - line 17 * * page 175, column l, line 5 - line 12 * * page 175, column r, line 1 - line 14 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcatb.2003.05.006
 [Y]  - KIM H ET AL, "CLONING AND SEQUENCING OF THE ALPHA-1 6 DEXTRANSUCRASE GENE FROM LEUCONOSTOC MENSENTEROIDES B-742CB", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, KOREAN SOCIETY FOR APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, SEOUL, KR, (20000801), vol. 10, no. 4, ISSN 1017-7825, pages 559 - 563, XP008057614 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 559, column r, line 7 - line 29 * * page 562, column r, line 8 - line 14 * * page 562, column r, line 34 - page 563, column l, line 2 *
 [A]  - KANG H K ET AL, "Bioengineering of Leuconostoc mesenteroides Glucansucrases That Gives Selected Bond Formation for Glucan Synthesis and/or Acceptor-Product Synthesis", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 59, no. 8, doi:10.1021/JF104629G, ISSN 0021-8561, (20110427), pages 4148 - 4155, (20110310), XP002720575 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * Mutant construction, Enzyme Expression, and Purification.; page 4149 * * Products Synthesized from Sucrose and Acceptor Reactions.; page 4149 - page 4150 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf104629g
 [A]  - CHUNG C-H ET AL, "GLUCOOLIGOSACCHARIDES FROM LEUCONOSTOC MESENTEROIDES B-742 (ATCC 13146): A POTENTIAL PREBIOTIC", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, BASINGSTOKE, GB, (20021001), vol. 29, no. 4, doi:10.1038/SJ.JIM.7000269, ISSN 1367-5435, pages 196 - 199, XP008024426 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.jim.7000269
 [A]  - HANS LEEMHUIS ET AL, "Glucansucrases: Three-dimensional structures, reactions, mechanism, [alpha]-glucan analysis and their implications in biotechnology and food applications", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130101), vol. 163, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.jbiotec.2012.06.037, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 250 - 272, XP055102852 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2012.06.037
by applicantUS7772212
    - CANTAREL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2009), vol. 37, pages D233 - 238
    - JEANES; SEYMOUR, CARBUHYDRATE RESEARCH, vol. 74, pages 31 - 40
    - COTE; ROBYT, CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1983), vol. 119, pages 141 - 156
    - REMAUD ET AL., J, CARBOHYDRATE CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 11, no. 3
    - SEYMOUR ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1979), vol. 74, pages 41 - 62
    - CHUNG; DAY, JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY & BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 29, pages 196 - 199
    - CHUNG; DAY, POULTRY SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 83, pages 1302 - 1306
    - LEEMHUIS ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2013), vol. 163, no. 2, pages 250 - 72
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, AD. APP. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEDDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J MOL, BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. CD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - EDGAR, ROBERT C., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 32, page 1792
    - GOUJON M; MCWILLIAM H; LI W; VALENTIN F; SQUIZZATO S; PAERN J; LOPEZ R., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (201007), vol. 38, pages W695 - 9
    - GOFFIN ET AL., CRIT REV. FOOD SCI. NUTR., (2011), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 394 - 409
    - SARBINI ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2011), vol. 77, no. 15, pages 5307 - 15