Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3019236

EP3019236 - SYSTEM GENERATING A CONSTRAINT FIELD, AND MEDICAL DEVICE IMPLEMENTING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2018Change - inventor 
24.08.2018Change - applicantpublished on 26.09.2018  [2018/39]
24.08.2018Change - inventorpublished on 26.09.2018  [2018/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cell Constraint & Cancer (CC&C)
331 chemin de la poterie
le mas l'hermite
13280 Raphèle-les-Arles / FR
[2018/39]
Former [2016/20]For all designated states
Brossel, Rémy
Le Mas l'Hermite
331 chemin de la Poterie
13280 Raphele les Arles / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BROSSEL, Rémy
331, chemin de la poterie
le mas l'hermite
13280 Raphèle-les-Arles / FR
 [2018/39]
Former [2016/20]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Icosa
83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau
75014 Paris / FR
[2016/20]
Application number, filing date14738529.811.07.2014
[2016/20]
WO2014EP64995
Priority number, dateEP2013017636412.07.2013         Original published format: EP 13176364
[2016/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015004285
Date:15.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3019236
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/40, A61K41/00, A61K49/00
[2016/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES EINGESCHRÄNKTEN FELDES UND MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG DAVON[2016/20]
English:SYSTEM GENERATING A CONSTRAINT FIELD, AND MEDICAL DEVICE IMPLEMENTING THE SAME[2016/20]
French:SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION DE CHAMP DE CONTRAINTE ET DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL METTANT EN UVRE LEDIT SYSTÈME[2016/20]
Entry into regional phase12.02.2016National basic fee paid 
12.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/20]
24.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2008132214  (BROSSEL REMY [FR]) [X] 1-12 * example 2 * * figures 2-4 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 4 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 33 *;
 [XD]EP2508171  (UNIVERSITAETSKLINIKUM ERLANGEN [DE], et al) [XD] 1-12 * page 5, lines 42-47 * * paragraphs [0050] , [0055] , [0056] , [0059] , [0060] , [0082] , [0095] * * claims 1-3,8,12-15,21 *;
 [XD]US2011223255  (THIESEN BURGHARD [DE], et al) [XD] 1-12 * paragraphs [0048] , [0049] , [0128] , [0194] * * claims 12,22 *