blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3019236 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3019236



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 190
27.08.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
27.08.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.08.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.08.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
14.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.08.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
14.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.08.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.08.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
24.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.02.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.02.2016 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
10.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.02.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
26.01.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
20.11.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.02.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
15.01.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
15.01.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 39
16.09.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
16.09.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
16.09.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
11.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
11.07.2014 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
11.07.2014 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
11.07.2014 Description PCT receiving Office 24
11.07.2014 Drawings PCT receiving Office 8
11.07.2014 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 25