blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3019236


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.08.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.08.2019 First examination report
03.08.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.08.2018 Change - inventor
24.08.2018 Change - applicant published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
24.08.2018 Change - inventor published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
03.08.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2016 Change - extension states published on  19.10.2016  [2016/42]
26.08.2016 Amendment by applicant
03.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.04.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
15.04.2016 Request for examination filed published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
02.03.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
16.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
10.02.2016 Change - representative
10.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
29.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
12.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication