blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3019236 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP13176364 EP14738529



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016143859Global Dossier 26.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP64995 11.07.2014
EP13176364 12.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6534660BGlobal Dossier 26.06.2019B2
JP2016532674 20.10.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP64995 11.07.2014
EP13176364 12.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3019236Global Dossier 18.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP64995 11.07.2014
EP14738529 11.07.2014
EP13176364 12.07.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015004285Global Dossier 15.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP13176364 12.07.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2823858Global Dossier 14.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP13176364 12.07.2013