EP3091886 - SANITARY TOILET COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pádár, Csaba Kinizsi utca 35 fsz.1 1092 Budapest / HU | [2016/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | Kacsuk, Zsófia Kacsukpatent Kft. Üteg u. 11/a 1139 Budapest / HU | [2016/46] | Application number, filing date | 14739550.3 | 30.05.2014 | [2016/46] | WO2014HU00049 | Priority number, date | WO2014HU00006 | 10.01.2014 Original published format: PCT/HU2014/000006 | [2016/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015104568 | Date: | 16.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091886 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47K13/16 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
A47K13/16 (EP,US);
A47K11/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] | Title | German: | SANITÄRTOILETTENDECKEL | [2018/23] | English: | SANITARY TOILET COVER | [2016/46] | French: | COUVERTURE SANITAIRE DE TOILETTES | [2018/23] |
Former [2016/46] | SANITÄRTOILETTENABDECKUNG | ||
Former [2016/46] | PROTECTION HYGIÉNIQUE POUR TOILETTES | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 03.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]US2011271433 (ASPIRO STEPHANIE [CA]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 5] , [00 9] * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 18] , [0 19] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0 39] * * paragraphs [0043] , [0 46] - [0048] * * claims 1, 2, 5, 6 ,20 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 6 [Y] 2-4 [I] 8-13; | [YA]GB1339675 (HENDERSON H M) [Y] 2-4 * column 1, lines 10-41 * * column 2, lines 55-92 * * claims 1-5, 7, 8 * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 6,8; | [A]US2012131740 (RONE THOMAS MICHAEL [US]) [A] 7,9,12,13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 10] , [0 11] * * paragraphs [0016] , [0 25] , [0 27] * * paragraph [0028] * * claims 2, 4, 5, 10-13, 15, 18 * * figures 1, 2, 4, 6-8 *; | [A]ES1060310U (HIDALGO RIOS JOSE ANTONIO [ES], et al) [A] 1,6,8,10,11 * column 1, lines 33-40 * * column 2, lines 8-15 * * figures 1-2 * | by applicant | US8418273 |