Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3019210

EP3019210 - MANUALLY POWERED, REGULATED, NEGATIVE PRESSURE PUMP WITH ADAPTER FOR EXTERNAL PRESSURE SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2017/02]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
12930 IH-10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US
Former [2016/20]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COULTHARD, Richard Daniel John
6 Acorn Way
Verwood, Dorset BH31 6LL / GB
02 / LOCKE, Christopher Brian
6 Bosworth Mews
Bournemouth Dorset BH9 3SD / GB
 [2016/20]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/20]Biggs, Philip James
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date14739645.123.06.2014
[2016/20]
WO2014US43719
Priority number, dateUS201361844743P10.07.2013         Original published format: US 201361844743 P
[2016/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015006041
Date:15.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3019210
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00
[2016/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
TitleGerman:HANDBETRIEBENE UND REGULIERTE UNTERDRUCKPUMPE MIT EINEM ADAPTER FÜR EINE EXTERNE DRUCKQUELLE[2016/20]
English:MANUALLY POWERED, REGULATED, NEGATIVE PRESSURE PUMP WITH ADAPTER FOR EXTERNAL PRESSURE SOURCE[2016/20]
French:POMPE À DÉPRESSION RÉGULÉE, À ACTIONNEMENT MANUEL, AVEC ADAPTATEUR POUR SOURCE DE PRESSION EXTERNE[2016/20]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2016National basic fee paid 
25.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2465797  (IND TECH RES INST [TW]) [X] 1-11,38 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025]; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO2009135171  (KCI LICENSING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6174306  (FLEISCHMANN WIM [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *