Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2936889

EP2936889 - COMMUNICATING DATA USING A LOCAL WIRELESS ACCESS NETWORK NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / GAO, Shiwei
78 Roswell Drive
Nepean, Ontario K2J OH5 / CA
02 / BLANKENSHIP, Yufei Wu
21910 Pine Lake Circle
Kildeer, Illinois 60047 / US
03 / CAI, Zhijun
43045 Clarks Mill Terrace
Ashburn, Virginia, 20148 / US
04 / SONG, Yi
2212 Windy Ridge Court
Plano, Texas 75025 / US
 [2019/21]
Former [2015/44]01 / GAO, Shiwei
78 Roswell Drive
Nepean, Ontario K2J OH5 / CA
02 / BLANKENSHIP, Yufei Wu
21910 Pine Lake Circle
Kildeer, Illinois 60047 / US
03 / CAI, Zhijun
5000 Riverside Drive
Brazos East
Suite 100
Ext. 63775
Irving, Texas 75039 / US
04 / SONG, Yi
2212 Windy Ridge Court
Plano, Texas 75025 / US
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[2019/21]
Former [2015/44]Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna Moore + Curley
13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2, D02 T668 / IE
Application number, filing date14740212.707.01.2014
[2015/44]
WO2014US10469
Priority number, dateUS20131374505118.01.2013         Original published format: US201313745051
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014113236
Date:24.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2936889
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014
[2015/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2936889
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/28, H04W36/22, // H04W36/30, H04W84/04, H04W52/04, H04W28/08, H04W36/00
[2018/50]
Former International [2016/33]H04W36/28, H04W36/22, // H04W36/30, H04W84/04, H04W52/04
Former International [2015/44]H04W52/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DATENKOMMUNIKATION MIT EINEM LOKALEN DRAHTLOSEN ZUGANGSNETZKNOTEN[2015/44]
English:COMMUNICATING DATA USING A LOCAL WIRELESS ACCESS NETWORK NODE[2015/44]
French:COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES AU MOYEN D'UN NOEUD DE RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS LOCAL SANS FIL[2015/44]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2015National basic fee paid 
24.07.2015Search fee paid 
24.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
03.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.03.2019Fee for grant paid
26.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.04.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
16.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19170060.8  / EP3534647
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RS22.05.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RS22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[I]US2013003699  (LIU KAI [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0145] *;
 [I]WO2012138760  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0070] *;
 [I]US2012184266  (FACCIN STEFANO [US], et al) [I] 1 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0158] * * paragraph [0344] *;
 [A]US2012214445  (STOJANOVSKI SASO [FR], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0009] *;
 [A]WO2012166975  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, last 4 lines of first paragraph * * page 12, second paragraph *;
 [A]US2012039304  (KIM TAE-HYEON [KR], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] *;
 [A]WO2011085373  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0323] *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Local IP Access and Selected IP Traffic Offload (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP 23.829, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100801), no. V1.2.0, pages 1 - 44, XP050476377 [A] 1 * chapter 5.5.3 Traffic Offload Function * * chapter 5.6.1 *
 [A]  - 3GPP TSG CT4, "LS on EPC-routed access & Non-seamless offload Authorization", vol. CT WG4, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20120416 - 20120420, (20120420), 3GPP DRAFT; C4-120726, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ct/WG4_protocollars_ex-CN4/TSGCT4_56bis_Taipei/Docs/, (20120420), XP050657853 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2012214445  (STOJANOVSKI SASO [FR], et al);
 [X]US2009040982  (HO SAI YIU [US], et al);
 [A]US2009232019  (GUPTA RAJARSHI [US], et al);
 [A]US2008069020  (RICHARDSON ANDREW [GB])
by applicantUS2013003699