Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2946400

EP2946400 - SURFACE PRETREATMENT AND DROP SPREADING CONTROL ON MULTI COMPONENT SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.10.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Camtek Ltd
Ramat Gabriel Industrial Park P.O.B 544
23150 Migdal-Haemek / IL
[2015/48]
Inventor(s)01 / NITZAN, Boaz
21 HaBrosh Street
4493500 Sde Warburg / IL
 [2015/48]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2015/48]
Application number, filing date14740366.121.01.2014
[2015/48]
WO2014IL50066
Priority number, dateUS201361754718P21.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361754718 P
[2015/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014111942
Date:24.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2946400
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014
[2015/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL24.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/02, H01L21/308, H05K3/00, B41J11/62, B41M5/00, B41J11/00, H01L21/306, H05K3/34, // H05K3/38
[2016/36]
Former International [2015/48]H01L21/02, H01L21/308, H05K3/00, B41J11/62
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/48]
TitleGerman:OBERFLÄCHENVORBEHANDLUNG UND TROPFENVERTEILUNGSSTEUERUNG AUF OBERFLÄCHEN MIT MEHREREN KOMPONENTEN[2015/48]
English:SURFACE PRETREATMENT AND DROP SPREADING CONTROL ON MULTI COMPONENT SURFACES[2015/48]
French:PRÉTRAITEMENT DE SURFACE ET COMMANDE DE DIFFUSION DE GOUTTES SUR DES SURFACES À COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES[2015/48]
Entry into regional phase13.07.2015National basic fee paid 
13.07.2015Search fee paid 
13.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/48]
06.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2010230696  (FUKUNAGA TAKAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,13,14 * claims 1,2,4,6 * * paragraphs [0136] , [0144] , [0181] , [0198] , [0254] , [0256] , [0260] , [0261] , [0272] * * figures 15A-16B * [Y] 10-12 [I] 7,8;
 [X]US2003003231  (KIGUCHI HIROSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,4,13,14 * claims 1,20 * * paragraphs [0076] , [0098] , [0099] , [0100] *;
 [Y]US2006046069  (JUNG GUN Y [US] ET AL) [Y] 10-12 * claims 1,8,11 * * paragraphs [0022] , [0031] , [0032] , [0041] , [0042] , [0044] , [0046] * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2003113229  (BRIONES NATALIA [US] ET AL) [A] 10-12 * claims 1,4,6,7 * * paragraph [0034] *
International search[X]US2006159838  (CABOT CORPORATION);
 [X]US2012314007  (SHIMOFUKU AKIRA ET AL.);
 [A]US2012217165  (FENG HSIEN-PING ET AL.);
 [A]US2003232128  (FURUSAWAMASAHIRO ET AL.)
by applicantUS2010230696
 US2003003231