blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2805559 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2805559



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 362
04.01.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.02.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
26.01.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.01.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
09.01.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
09.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.01.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.01.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
05.01.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
05.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.10.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
24.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 37
10.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
10.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
10.08.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
08.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
08.08.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
10.05.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
10.05.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.05.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
30.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
30.12.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
30.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
10.12.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.11.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 12
29.10.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
20.10.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
09.10.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.09.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
21.08.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.08.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.08.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.08.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
19.06.2015 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
17.06.2015 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
02.09.2014 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
21.08.2014 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
13.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
13.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 57
24.07.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.07.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 35