blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2805559


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
29.12.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  31.01.2018  [2018/05]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
20.01.2017 (Expected) grant published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
17.01.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.01.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.01.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.10.2016 Change - applicant
21.10.2016 Change - applicant published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
14.10.2016 Change - classification published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
07.10.2016 Change - classification published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
07.10.2016 Change - German title published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
07.10.2016 Change - English title published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
07.10.2016 Change - French title published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
08.08.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.05.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.05.2016 First examination report
25.03.2016 Change - extension states published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
12.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2015 Change - classification published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
04.11.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
16.10.2015 Change - inventor published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
15.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication