blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2805559 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480004896 EP14740544



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105122917Global Dossier 02.12.2015A
Priority number Date
US201414157212 16.01.2014
US201361754201 18.01.2013
WO2014CN70797 17.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2805559Global Dossier 22.02.2017B1
EP2805559 02.12.2015A4
EP2805559 26.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414157212 16.01.2014
US201361754201 18.01.2013
WO2014CN70797 17.01.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014111042Global Dossier 24.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414157212 16.01.2014
US201361754201 18.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9794803Global Dossier 17.10.2017B2
US2014204783 24.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414157212 16.01.2014
US201361754201 18.01.2013