Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805559

EP2805559 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DYNAMIC ADAPTATION OF TDD CONFIGURATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/48]SYSTEM AND METHODS OF DYNAMIC TDD CONFIGURATIONS
[2016/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, SI
published on 11.04.2018  [2018/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MediaTek Inc.
No.1, Dusing Road
1st Science-Based Industrial Park
Hsin-Chu
Taiwan 300 / TW
[2016/47]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
MediaTek Inc.
No. 1, Dusing Road 1st Science-Based Industrial Park
Hsin-Chu 300 / TW
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Shiang-Jiun
No.78 Ln. 30
Sec. 1
Guangfu Rd.
East Dist.
Hsinchu City Taiwan 300 / TW
02 / HWANG, Chien-Hwa
No.255 Guangming 9th Rd.
Zhubei City Hsinchu County Taiwan 302 / TW
03 / ZHUANG, Xiangyang
No. 1, Dusing Rd. 1st.,
Science-Based Industrial Park
Hsin-Chu 300
Taiwan, R.O.C. / US
 [2015/47]
Former [2014/48]01 / LIN, Shiang-Jiun
No.78 Ln. 30
Sec. 1
Guangfu Rd.
East Dist.
Hsinchu City Taiwan 300 / TW
02 / HWANG, Chien-Hwa
No.255 Guangming 9th Rd.
Zhubei City Hsinchu County Taiwan 302 / TW
03 / ZHUANG, Xiangyang
1380 Louise Court
Lake Zurich, Illinois 60047 / US
Representative(s)Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel
Montgelasstrasse 2
81679 Munich / DE
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date14740544.317.01.2014
[2017/08]
WO2014CN70797
Priority number, dateUS201361754201P18.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361754201 P
US20141415721216.01.2014         Original published format: US201414157212
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014111042
Date:24.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805559
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805559
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN24.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, // H04W48/12, H04W72/12, H04W74/00, H04L1/18, H04L5/14
[2015/49]
Former International [2014/48]H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DYNAMISCHEN ANPASSUNG VON TDD-KONFIGURATIONEN[2016/45]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DYNAMIC ADAPTATION OF TDD CONFIGURATIONS[2016/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR L'ADAPTATION DYNAMIQUE DE CONFIGURATIONS TDD[2016/45]
Former [2014/48]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DYNAMISCHE TDD-KONFIGURATIONEN
Former [2014/48]SYSTEM AND METHODS OF DYNAMIC TDD CONFIGURATIONS
Former [2014/48]SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONFIGURATION TDD DYNAMIQUE
Entry into regional phase15.08.2014National basic fee paid 
15.08.2014Search fee paid 
15.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
10.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2017Fee for grant paid
05.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2016
Opposition(s)23.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
[2018/14]
Former [2017/51]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2012122919  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 9-12 * abstract *;
 []US2014056185  (YU ZHENG [CN]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0020] , [0033] , [0035] , [0040] - [0049] - [0051] , [0056] , [0057] , [0061] , [0076] - [0084] - [0087] - [0090] * * figure 3 *;
 [Y]US2011211503  (CHE XIANG GUANG [CN], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010] , [0013] - [0015] - [0053] , [0058] - [0060] * * figures 5,7,8 *;
 [Y]US2012320806  (JI HYOUNGJU [KR], et al) [Y] 7,15,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0017] , [0018] , [0048] , [0054] - [0057] - [0060] , [0061] , [0062] , [0071] , [0086] , [0087] , [0090] * * figures 2,4,9,10 *;
 [XYI]  - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE LTD, "Discussion on Enhancements for Dynamic TDD UL-DL Configuration", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122363, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050600626 [X] 1,2 * sections 1, 2.1, 2.3 * * table 2 * [Y] 6,7,9-12,15,19 [I] 3-5,8,13,14,16-18,20
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical Channels and Modulation (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.211, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20121220), vol. RAN WG1, no. V11.1.0, pages 1 - 108, XP050691221 [A] 1-20 * sections 4.2, 5.7.1 * * tables 4.2-2 * * tables 5.7.1-4 *
International search[X]CN102832989  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD);
 [A]WO2012106840  (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al);
 [A]CN102843732  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD)