Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2947362

EP2947362 - RETRACTABLE HANDLE ASSEMBLY, AND VALVE AND MID-SIZED BULK CONTAINER USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.2020
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shanghai Hongyan Returnable Transit Packagings Co., Ltd.
Room 1105, No. 20 Building
No. 487 Tianlin Rd.
Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
[2015/48]
Inventor(s)01 / FANG, Zhengwei
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Roo 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 787 Tian Lin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
02 / QIAN, Zuocheng
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Roo 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 487 Tian Lin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
03 / GONG, Kai
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Roo 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 487 Tian Lin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
04 / LIAO, Qingxin
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Roo 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 487 Tian Lin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
 [2019/10]
Former [2015/51]01 / FANG, Zhengwei
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Roo 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 787 Tian Lin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
02 / QIAN, Zuocheng
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Roo 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 787 Tian Lin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
03 / GONG, Kai
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Roo 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 787 Tian Lin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
04 / LIAO, Qingxin
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Roo 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 787 Tian Lin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2015/48]
Application number, filing date14740653.220.01.2014
[2015/48]
WO2014CN70899
Priority number, dateCN2013102221021.01.2013         Original published format: CN201310022210
[2015/48]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014111055
Date:24.07.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2947362
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2947362
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN24.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16K31/60, F16K35/00, B65D55/02, B65D47/24
[2016/44]
Former International [2015/48]F16K31/60, F16K35/02, B65D55/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINZIEHBARE GRIFFANORDNUNG SOWIE VENTIL UND MITTELGROSSER SCHÜTTGUTBEHÄLTER DAMIT[2015/48]
English:RETRACTABLE HANDLE ASSEMBLY, AND VALVE AND MID-SIZED BULK CONTAINER USING SAME[2015/48]
French:ENSEMBLE POIGNÉE RÉTRACTABLE ET SOUPAPE ET CONTENEUR DE VRAC DE TAILLE MOYENNE L'UTILISANT[2015/48]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2015Translation filed 
20.08.2015National basic fee paid 
20.08.2015Search fee paid 
20.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/48]
28.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2018Date of oral proceedings
24.09.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2019Fee for grant paid
21.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2017
Opposition(s)09.12.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
IS06.07.2019
PT06.07.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2020/03]AL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/52]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/51]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/49]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004088185  (PARK SIL-SANG [KR]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, lines 20-24 * * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 9 *;
 [X]US1395678  (JONES LAWRENCE R) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0021885  (GACHOT JEAN) [X] 1-3,8-10 * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US1387971  (FARMER CLYDE C) [X] 1-3,8-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1577081  (SCHUETZ GMBH & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0009]; figures 1-3 *
International search[XP]CN103075564  (SHANGHAI HOREN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.);
 [XP]CN203082342U  (SHANGHAI HOREN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.);
 [Y]US6050545  (STOLZMAN, M.D.);
 [Y]GB340447  (GEORGE, R.M.);
 [A]CN102285487  (SHANGHAI HOREN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.);
 [A]US1395678  (JONES, L.R.)