Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3010407

EP3010407 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING INFORMATION INDICATIVE OF CARDIAC MALFUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Precordior Oy
Savitehtaankatu 2 A 30
20540 Turku / FI
[2017/30]
Former [2016/17]For all designated states
Turun Yliopisto
Yliopistonmäki
20014 Turku / FI
Inventor(s)01 / KOIVISTO, Tero
Lemminkäisenkatu 19 C 61
FI-20520 Turku / FI
02 / VALTONEN, Tuomas
Hämeentie 20A 5
FI-20540 Turku / FI
03 / PÄNKÄÄLÄ, Mikko
Kuuanlaaksontie 1A 5
FI-21200 Raisio / FI
04 / SAIRANEN, Kati
Ripikatu 11C 22
FI-21110 Naantali / FI
 [2016/17]
Representative(s)Finnpatent Oy
Smart Chemistry Park
Raisionkaari 55
21200 Raisio / FI
[N/P]
Former [2016/17]Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date14741341.313.06.2014
[2016/17]
WO2014FI50477
Priority number, dateFI2013000566919.06.2013         Original published format: FI 20135669
[2016/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014202829
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3010407
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014
[2016/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/046, A61B5/11, G01R19/04
[2016/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FESTLEGUNG VON INFORMATIONEN ZUR ANZEIGE VON HERZFUNKTIONSSTÖRUNGEN[2016/17]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING INFORMATION INDICATIVE OF CARDIAC MALFUNCTIONS[2016/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UNE INFORMATION INDIQUANT DES DÉFAILLANCES CARDIAQUES[2016/17]
Entry into regional phase12.01.2016National basic fee paid 
12.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/17]
12.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011301480  (GHANEM RAJA N [US]) [X] 1,2,7-9,14,19,20,25-27,30-32 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,10-13,15-18,22-24,28,29;
 [A]US2003233034  (VARRI ALPO [FI], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7846106