Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3007742

EP3007742 - ELECTROACTIVE ACTUATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.10.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.04.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Nottingham Trent University
Clifton Lane
Nottingham NG11 8NS / GB
For all designated states
Nottingham University Hospitals NHS Trust
City Hospital Campus Hucknall Road
Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG5 1PB / GB
[2016/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BREEDON, Philip
The Nottingham Trent University
Burton Street
Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG1 4BU / GB
02 / COULTER, Fergal
c/o Nottingham Consultants Limited
Burton Street
Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG1 4BU / GB
03 / RICHENS, David
Laburnum Cottage
Mill Lane
Orston
Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG13 9NE / GB
 [2016/16]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/16]Pearce, David Henry
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date14741348.812.06.2014
[2016/16]
WO2014GB51813
Priority number, dateGB2013001057813.06.2013         Original published format: GB 201310578
[2016/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014199167
Date:18.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3007742
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014
[2016/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3007742
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/10, A61F2/00, A61M1/12
[2016/49]
Former International [2016/16]A61M1/10, A61F2/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROAKTIVE AKTUATOREN[2016/16]
English:ELECTROACTIVE ACTUATORS[2016/16]
French:ACTIONNEURS ÉLECTRO-ACTIFS[2016/16]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2015National basic fee paid 
13.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/16]
19.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.08.2017Fee for grant paid
15.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
30.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
IE12.06.2018
LU12.06.2018
MT12.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/24]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
IE12.06.2018
LU12.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
Former [2019/21]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
IE12.06.2018
LU12.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
Former [2019/19]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
IE12.06.2018
LU12.06.2018
Former [2019/17]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
LU12.06.2018
Former [2019/15]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004230090  (HEGDE ANANT V [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * dielectric elastomer; paragraphs [0116] , [0128] * * paragraphs [0196] - [0197]; figures 26,27 *;
 [A]WO2004086946  (PAVAD MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * * spring 556;; figure 5 *;
 [A]US2008262341  (BOYDEN EDWARD S [US], et al) [A] 1 * dielectric elastomers; paragraphs [0505] - [0506] *;
 [A]US2012060355  (TSUCHIKAWA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 8 * the whole document *