Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3019158

EP3019158 - STABILIZED PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORMS COMPRISING ATRASENTAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2018  [2018/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AbbVie Inc.
1 North Waukegan Road
AP06A - V0377
Chicago, IL 60064 / US
[2016/20]
Inventor(s)01 / HUANG, Ye
33873 N. Summerfields Drive
Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US
02 / KOSKI, Andrew, K.
1325 Chatsworth Lane
Hoffmann Estates, Illinois 60169 / US
03 / PETERSON, Katherine, E.
2577 N. Augusta Drive
Wadsworth, Illinois 60083 / US
 [2016/20]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2016/20]
Application number, filing date14741777.807.07.2014
[2016/20]
WO2014US45581
Priority number, dateUS201361843799P08.07.2013         Original published format: US 201361843799 P
[2016/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015006219
Date:15.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3019158
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20, A61K9/24, A61K9/28
[2016/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
Extension statesBA25.01.2016
ME25.01.2016
TitleGerman:STABILISIERTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE DOSIERUNGSFORMEN MIT ATRASENTAN[2016/20]
English:STABILIZED PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORMS COMPRISING ATRASENTAN[2016/20]
French:FORMES PHARMACEUTIQUES STABILISÉES COMPRENANT DE L'ATRASENTAN[2016/20]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2016National basic fee paid 
25.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/20]
23.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/32]
19.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2006034094  (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO2006034084  (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [AD] 1-36 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5731434
 US5622971
 US5767144
 US6162927
 US6380241
 US6462194
 US6946481
 US7208517
 US7365093
 WO2006034085
 WO2006034094
 WO2006034084
 WO2006034234