blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3025547 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3025547



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 736
09.05.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.07.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 88
22.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 88
13.02.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.02.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.02.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.01.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.07.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
04.05.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
29.02.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.02.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
22.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.01.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.12.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
16.02.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 76
16.02.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 88
29.01.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
29.01.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 91
25.09.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
25.09.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
25.09.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
23.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
23.07.2014 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
23.07.2014 Claims PCT receiving Office 11
23.07.2014 Description PCT receiving Office 57
23.07.2014 Drawings PCT receiving Office 22
23.07.2014 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 87
23.07.2014 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 75