Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2948106

EP2948106 - ADJUSTABLE INTERBODY FUSION DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.11.2015
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioSpine, LLC
10170 5865 East State Road 14
Columbia City, IN 46725 / US
[2018/22]
Former [2015/49]For all designated states
Biomet Spine, LLC
310 Interlocken Parkway, Suite 120
Broomfield, CO 80021 / US
Inventor(s)01 / EMERICK, Brian G.
5865 East State Road 14
Columbia City, Indiana 46725 / US
02 / REFAI, M.D., Daniel
5240 Northside Drive NW
Atlanta, Georgia 30327 / US
03 / NICHOLS, Ross R.
9233 East Backwater Road
North Webster, Indiana 46555 / US
 [2015/49]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company , et al
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/49]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14742780.124.01.2014
[2015/49]
WO2014US12848
Priority number, dateUS201361756048P24.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361756048 P
[2015/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014116891
Date:31.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2948106
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014
[2015/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/44
[2015/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
TitleGerman:EINSTELLBARE ZWISCHENWIRBELFUSIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG[2015/49]
English:ADJUSTABLE INTERBODY FUSION DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE[2015/49]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FUSION INTERSOMATIQUE RÉGLABLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION[2015/49]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2015National basic fee paid 
13.08.2015Search fee paid 
13.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
19.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO2013158294  (BIOSPINE LLC [US]) [XP] 1 * paragraph [0189]; figure 64b *;
 [XP]WO2013155418  (NEUROPRO TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [XP] 1 * page 22, line 16 - line 22; figure 17b *;
 [Y]US2009299478  (CARLS THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046]; figures 5,10a *;
 [Y]WO2011011609  (SPINEX TEC LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1 * figure 10d *;
 [A]EP2226039  (BOEHM HEINRICH DR [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]US6685742  (JACKSON ROGER P [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,6 *
International search[X]US4759769  (HEDMAN THOMAS P [CA], et al);
 [X]US8303663  (JIMENEZ OMAR F [US], et al);
 [Y]WO2010120782  (BIOSPINE LLC [US], et al);
 [Y]US2012310350  (FARRIS JEFFREY A [US], et al);
 [Y]US2011245927  (FARRIS JEFFREY A [US]);
 [Y]US8075600  (SCHLAEPFER FRIDOLIN [CH]);
 [Y]US8011551  (MARCZYK STANISLAW [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010274299  (LAWSON JONATHAN [GB], et al);
 [Y]US2010168861  (YUNDT KENT D [US]);
 [A]US2002173817  (KLETSCHKA HAROLD D [US], et al);
 [A]US2011106172  (WALLENSTEIN TODD [US], et al);
 [A]WO2010033445  (SPINEFRONTIER INC [US])
by applicantWO2013158294