Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2948895

EP2948895 - PRESSURE TRANSIENT TESTING WITH SENSITIVITY ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
For:BE  EE  ES  FI  IS  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  RS  SE  SM 
PRAD Research and Development Limited
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
[2015/49]
Inventor(s)01 / MORTON, Kirsty
Services Techniques Schlumberger
1 rue Henri Bequerel
BP 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
02 / CHUGUNOV, Nikita
Schlumberger Doll-Research
One Hampshire Street
MD-A139
Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US
03 / KUCHUK, Fikri John
Services Techniques Schlumberger
1 rue Henri Bequerel
BP 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
04 / BOOTH, Richard
Rua Paulo Emidio Barbosa
Quadra VII-B
Parque Tecnologico do Rio - UFRJ
Cidade Universitaria
21941-907 Rio de Janeiro / BR
05 / FITZPATRICK, Anthony
Services Techniques Schlumberger
1 rue Henri Bequerel
BP 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
06 / BIRYUKOV, Denis
Services Techniques Schlumberger
1 rue Henri Bequerel
BP 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
 [2019/24]
Former [2015/49]01 / MORTON, Kirsty
Services Techniques Schlumberger
1 rue Henri Bequerel
BP 202
F-92142 Clamart CEDEX / FR
02 / CHUGUNOV, Nikita
Schlumberger Doll-Research
One Hampshire Street
MD-A139
Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US
03 / KUCHUK, Fikri John
Services Techniques Schlumberger
1 rue Henri Bequerel
BP 202
F-92142 Clmart CEDEX / FR
04 / BOOTH, Richard
Rua Paulo Emidio Barbosa
Quadra VII-B
Parque Tecnologico do Rio - UFRJ
Cidade Universitaria
21941-907 Rio de Janeiro / BR
05 / FITZPATRICK, Anthony
Services Techniques Schlumberger
1 rue Henri Bequerel
BP 202
F-92142 Clamart CEDEX / FR
06 / BIRYUKOV, Denis
Services Techniques Schlumberger
1 rue Henri Bequerel
BP 202
F-92142 Clamart CEDEX / FR
Representative(s)Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department
Parkstraat 83
2514 JG Den Haag / NL
[2019/24]
Former [2015/49]Leonori, Céline
Etudes et Productions Schlumberger
Intellectual Property Department
1, rue Henri Becquerel
B.P. 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date14743860.024.01.2014
[2015/49]
WO2014US12861
Priority number, dateUS201361756825P25.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361756825 P
[2015/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014116896
Date:31.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2948895
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014
[2015/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2948895
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01V1/50, E21B49/00
[2017/16]
Former International [2015/49]G06G7/50, G01V1/50, G01V3/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRUCKÜBERGANGSTEST MIT SENSITIVITÄTSANALYSE[2015/49]
English:PRESSURE TRANSIENT TESTING WITH SENSITIVITY ANALYSIS[2015/49]
French:TEST DE TRANSITOIRE DE PRESSION AVEC ANALYSE DE SENSIBILITÉ[2015/49]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2015National basic fee paid 
14.10.2015Search fee paid 
29.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/49]
29.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
01.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2015/49]
13.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2019Fee for grant paid
30.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
14.10.2015Request for further processing filed
14.10.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.10.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009043555  (BUSBY DANIEL [FR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0114] * [I] 3,6-8;
 [A]US2006241867  (KUCHUK FIKRI [US] ET AL) [A] 1-8,14,15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0124] *;
 [A]  - K L Morton ET AL, "SPE 154531 Integrated Interpretation for Pressure Transient Tests in Discretely Fractured Reservoirs", doi:10.2118/154531-MS, ISBN 978-1-61399-204-3, (20120604), URL: https://www.onepetro.org/download/conference-paper/SPE-154531-MS?id=conference-paper%2FSPE-154531-MS, (20170303), XP055351479 [A] 1-8,14,15 * last paragraph; page 6 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/154531-MS
International search[X]US2002120429  (ORTOLEVA, P);
 [X]US2010299126  (CHUGUNOV, N ET AL.);
 [Y]US2012143578  (FOURNIER, F)
by applicantUS2009043555