Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3027100 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3027100



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1731
25.01.2024 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
23.01.2024 Communication about missing proof of delivery Appeal 1
21.12.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 29
21.12.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
21.12.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
13.11.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.11.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.11.2023 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
09.11.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
06.11.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 18
06.11.2023 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
03.11.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.11.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.11.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
30.10.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
27.10.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.10.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.10.2023 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
15.09.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 19
15.09.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 19
26.06.2023 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Search / examination 1
21.06.2023 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
21.06.2023 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
16.06.2023 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.10.2022 Consolidated list of documents cited in appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.03.2022 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.12.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 14 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 15 Appeal 3
30.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
30.11.2020 Reply to appeal Appeal 39
22.07.2020 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.07.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.07.2020 Citation in appeal procedure - 026 Appeal 184
16.07.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.07.2020 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
14.05.2020 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
14.05.2020 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
29.04.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.04.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.04.2020 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.03.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.03.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.03.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 24
16.03.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 24
16.03.2020 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
16.03.2020 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.03.2020 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
16.03.2020 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
16.03.2020 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.03.2020 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.03.2020 Means of redress Opposition 2
16.03.2020 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2020 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2020 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
16.03.2020 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.02.2020 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 47
16.12.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 15
13.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 4
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 Opposition 3
13.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.12.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
11.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.12.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 13
06.09.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.09.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.09.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.09.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.09.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.09.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.09.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.09.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
14.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.08.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
14.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.08.2019 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
13.08.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.08.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.08.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.08.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.08.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.08.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.08.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
09.08.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.08.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.04.2019 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 18
17.01.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
10.01.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 76
04.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.01.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 22
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 4
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 12
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 28
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 61
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 11
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 37
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 4
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 16
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 13
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 9
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 11
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 14
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 20
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 014 Opposition 11
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 015 Opposition 18
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 016 Opposition 4
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 017 Opposition 7
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 018 Opposition 2
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 019 Opposition 17
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 020 Opposition 4
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 021 Opposition 5
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 022 Opposition 17
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 023 Opposition 20
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 024 Opposition 56
04.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 025 Opposition 7
04.01.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
04.01.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
02.07.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.06.2018 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure International Searching Authority 1
25.06.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
20.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.02.2018 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.02.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.02.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
21.02.2018 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.01.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.01.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
11.01.2018 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
08.12.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.12.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.12.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.12.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 20
08.12.2017 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 20
27.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
27.10.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 16
27.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
27.10.2017 Description Search / examination 15
27.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.10.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.10.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.10.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.10.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.08.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
13.04.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 16
13.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
13.04.2017 Description Search / examination 15
13.04.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.02.2017 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 15
02.02.2017 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 15
02.02.2017 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 15
21.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.12.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
09.07.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
09.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
09.07.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 15
09.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 16
09.07.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
28.06.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.05.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.05.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
05.04.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.03.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
04.03.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.03.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
08.01.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
08.01.2016 Description Search / examination 16
08.01.2016 Drawings Search / examination 2
08.01.2016 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 10
08.01.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 5
08.01.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
09.12.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.02.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
05.02.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
05.02.2015 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 24
15.10.2014 Submission concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
30.09.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
30.09.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
30.09.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 2
22.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 1
24.07.2014 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
24.07.2014 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
24.07.2014 Description PCT receiving Office 16
24.07.2014 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2
24.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 1