Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2992716

EP2992716 - GENERATION OF TIMING PULSES BASED ON ACQUIRED SYNCHRONIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.03.2017  [2017/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/10]
Inventor(s)01 / SRIKANTIAH, Umesh
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / HANDE, Prashanth Haridas
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / PARHAR, Bhupinder Singh
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / BACHU, Raja Sekhar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/10]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/10]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14745291.608.07.2014
[2016/10]
WO2014US45806
Priority number, dateUS20131393717908.07.2013         Original published format: US201313937179
[2016/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015006359
Date:15.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2992716
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015
[2016/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W56/00
[2016/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
TitleGerman:ERZEUGUNG VON ZEITPULSEN BASIERT AUF DER BASIS VON ERFASSTER SYNCHRONISATION[2016/10]
English:GENERATION OF TIMING PULSES BASED ON ACQUIRED SYNCHRONIZATION[2016/10]
French:GÉNÉRATION D'IMPULSIONS DE TEMPORISATION SUR LA BASE D'UNE SYNCHRONISATION ACQUISE[2016/10]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2015National basic fee paid 
03.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/10]
08.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/13]
17.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011286400  (FU XIAOMING [CN]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0081] * * figure - * * claim - *;
 [A]US2001009856  (KANG HONG-KOO [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *