Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2952339

EP2952339 - GREEN TIRE SUPPORT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REMOVING DRUM FROM GREEN TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.07.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/50]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAIDA, Shinji
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/50]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14745393.031.01.2014
[2015/50]
WO2014JP00532
Priority number, dateJP2013001826501.02.2013         Original published format: JP 2013018265
[2015/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014119337
Date:07.08.2014
Language:JA
[2014/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2952339
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.08.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:B29D30/26, B60B30/02, B60B31/00
[2016/42]
Former International [2015/50]B29D30/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
TitleGerman:STÜTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR REIFENROHLINGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG EINER TROMMEL VON EINEM REIFENROHLING[2015/50]
English:GREEN TIRE SUPPORT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REMOVING DRUM FROM GREEN TIRE[2015/50]
French:DISPOSITIF SUPPORT DE PNEU CRU ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ENLEVER LE TAMBOUR DU PNEU CRU[2015/50]
Entry into regional phase27.07.2015Translation filed 
27.07.2015National basic fee paid 
27.07.2015Search fee paid 
27.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
20.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2005246890  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * figure - *;
 [A]JPH1179334  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * figure - *
International search[X]JPS5962134  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO);
 [Y]JPH01190438  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [Y]JP2004136607  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [A]JPS57205131  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD)
by applicantJPS63197273U